EP1479843 - Device for fixing a supporting section on a sheet metal roof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Domico Dach-, Wand- und Fassadensysteme Gesellschaft m.b.H. & Co. KG Salzburger Strasse 10 4870 Vöcklamarkt / AT | [2009/31] |
Former [2004/48] | For all designated states Domico Dach-, Wand- und Fassadensysteme Gesellschaft m.b.H. & Co. KG Salzburger Strasse 10 4870 Vöcklabruck / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hummer, Josef Albrechtsberg 10 4720 Pötting / AT | [2009/39] |
Former [2004/48] | 01 /
Hummer, Josef Albrechtsberg 10 4720 Pätting / AT | Representative(s) | Hübscher, Helmut, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Hübscher Postfach 411 4010 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | Hübscher, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Hübscher & Hübscher Postfach 380 Spittelwiese 7 4021 Linz / AT | ||
Former [2004/48] | Hübscher, Heiner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Spittelwiese 7 4020 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 04450112.0 | 21.05.2004 | [2004/48] | Priority number, date | AT20030000799 | 22.05.2003 Original published format: AT 7992003 | [2004/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1479843 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1479843 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E04D13/10 | [2004/48] | CPC: |
E04D13/10 (EP);
E04D3/362 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/48] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Befestigen eines Trägerprofils auf einem Blechdach | [2004/48] | English: | Device for fixing a supporting section on a sheet metal roof | [2004/48] | French: | Dispositif de fixation d'un profilé support sur une toiture en tôle | [2004/48] | Examination procedure | 11.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/23] | 19.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.07.2009 | DK | 29.07.2009 | EE | 29.07.2009 | FI | 29.07.2009 | IE | 29.07.2009 | IT | 29.07.2009 | NL | 29.07.2009 | PL | 29.07.2009 | RO | 29.07.2009 | SE | 29.07.2009 | TR | 29.07.2009 | BG | 29.10.2009 | GR | 30.10.2009 | ES | 09.11.2009 | PT | 29.11.2009 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/37] | CY | 29.07.2009 | |
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
IT | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | DK | 29.07.2009 | |
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
IT | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | DK | 29.07.2009 | |
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | DK | 29.07.2009 | |
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | DK | 29.07.2009 | |
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | FI | 29.07.2009 | |
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | FI | 29.07.2009 | |
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | FI | 29.07.2009 | |
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE8709561U (WITTWER) [A] 1,2 * figure - *; | [XA]DE9103193U (LONEVAG BESLAGKABRIKK) [X] 1 * figure - * [A] 2; | [A]EP0569324 (BUTLER MANUFACTURING CO [US]) [A] 2* abstract *; | [A]DE19540403 (WITTWER SIEGFRIED [DE]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | by applicant | DE2126082 | DE9103193U | DE19540403 |