EP1561940 - Gas exhaust recirculation assisted fuel injection system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.12.2008 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SZADKOWSKI I S-KA Spólka Komandytowa ul. Sienkiewicza 19 05-800 Pruszków / PL | [2007/05] |
Former [2005/32] | For all designated states Wiatrak, Wieslaw ul. Srednia 254 43-384 Jaworze / PL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wieslaw Wiatrak ul. Srednia 254 43-384 Jaworze / PL | [2007/05] |
Former [2005/32] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Chlebicka, Lidia, et al Kulikowska & Kulikowski sp.j. Ul. Kwiatowa 21/3 02-539 Warszawa / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | Chlebicka, Lidia, et al Kulikowska & Kulikowski sp.j. Ul. Kwiatowa 21/3 02-539 Warszawa / PL | Application number, filing date | 04460042.7 | 22.09.2004 | [2005/32] | Priority number, date | deleted | [2006/19] |
Former [2005/32] | PL20040364958 | 06.02.2004 | Filing language | PL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1561940 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1561940 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | [2006/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1561940 | Date: | 06.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F02M25/07, F02B19/02, F02B19/18, F02M67/06 | [2006/26] | CPC: |
F02B19/02 (EP);
F02B19/18 (EP);
F02M26/36 (EP);
F02M26/37 (EP);
F02M26/41 (EP);
F02M26/42 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2005/32] | F02M25/07 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/06] |
Former [2005/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | AGR-unterstützender Einspritzsystem | [2005/32] | English: | Gas exhaust recirculation assisted fuel injection system | [2005/32] | French: | Un système d'injection de combustible assisté par la recirculation de gaz d'échappement | [2005/32] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 14.11.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001 | 09.06.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/04] | 19.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.12.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.02.2008 | EE | 06.02.2008 | BG | 06.05.2008 | GR | 07.05.2008 | IE | 22.09.2008 | LU | 22.09.2008 | MC | 30.09.2008 | [2010/50] |
Former [2010/33] | CY | 06.02.2008 | |
EE | 06.02.2008 | ||
BG | 06.05.2008 | ||
IE | 22.09.2008 | ||
LU | 22.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 06.02.2008 | |
EE | 06.02.2008 | ||
BG | 06.05.2008 | ||
IE | 22.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | EE | 06.02.2008 | |
BG | 06.05.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | EE | 06.02.2008 | |
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | MC | 30.09.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0266610 (WALBRO CORP [US]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0597713 (ISUZU CERAMICS RES INST [JP]) [X] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [X]DE19923346 (DOSCH ELKE [DE], et al) [X] 1 * abstract ** column 4, line 31 - column 5, line 34; figure 2 *; | [X]EP1431564 (AVL LIST GMBH [AT]) [X] 1,3 * the whole document * |