EP1589934 - CERTAIN AMINOALKYL GLUCOSAMINIDE PHOSPHATE COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.08.2016 [2016/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CORIXA CORPORATION Corporation Service Company 2711 Centerville Road, Suite 400 Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | [2015/39] |
Former [2005/44] | For all designated states CORIXA CORPORATION 1900 9th Avenue Suite 1100 Seattle, WA 98101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNSON, David, A. 121 Woodland Way Hamilton, MT 59840 / US | [2005/44] | Representative(s) | Wells, Andrew, et al HGF Limited 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | [2015/39] |
Former [2014/07] | Wells, Andrew, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | ||
Former [2012/38] | Harrison Goddard Foote 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | ||
Former [2005/44] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 04700403.1 | 06.01.2004 | [2005/44] | WO2004US00377 | Priority number, date | US20030438585P | 06.01.2003 Original published format: US 438585 P | [2005/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004062599 | Date: | 29.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1589934 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1589934 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.01.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07H15/04 | [2011/36] | CPC: |
C07H13/04 (EP);
C07H15/04 (EP,KR);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07H11/04 (EP);
C07H5/02 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/10] | A61K31/7008 | ||
Former IPC [2005/44] | A61K7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/39] |
Former [2005/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BESTIMMTE AMINOALKYL-GLUCOSAMINID-PHOSPHATVERBINDUNGEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2005/44] | English: | CERTAIN AMINOALKYL GLUCOSAMINIDE PHOSPHATE COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USE | [2005/44] | French: | COMPOSÉS D'AMINOALKYLE GLUCOSAMINIDE PHOSPHATE ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2015/08] |
Former [2005/44] | COMPOSES D'AMINOALKYLE GLUCOSAMINIDE PHOSPHATE ET LEUR UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2005 | Search fee paid | 05.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/44] | 10.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15161799.0 / EP2940028 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0134617 (CORIXA CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-37 * the whole document *; | [A] - PERSING, DAVID H. ET AL, "Taking toll: lipid A mimetics as adjuvants and immunomodulators", TRENDS IN MICROBIOLOGY , 10(10, SUPPL.), S32-S37 CODEN: TRMIEA; ISSN: 0966-842X, (2002), XP009067296 [A] 1-37 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0966-842X(02)02426-5 | International search | [Y]US5593969 (KAMIREDDY BALREDDY [US], et al); | [Y]US6355257 (JOHNSON DAVID A [US], et al) | Examination | - H. G. BAZIN ET AL, "The "etheral" nature of TRL4 agonism and antagonism in the AGP class of lipid A mimetics", BIOORGANIC AND MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (2008), vol. 18, pages 5350 - 5354 | by applicant | US6008200 | US4436727 | US4603112 | US4683195 | US4683202 | US4751180 | GB2200651 | US4769330 | GB2202328 | US4777127 | US4790824 | WO8810315 | US4800159 | WO8901973 | WO8903429 | EP0320308 | WO8906700 | EP0329822 | US4866034 | US4877611 | US4883750 | EP0345242 | US4912094 | US4935233 | US4987237 | WO9102805 | US5017487 | WO9112882 | US5064413 | WO9118926 | WO9201070 | WO9203545 | US5128326 | US5139941 | EP0500799 | US5145684 | US5151254 | US5173414 | WO9303769 | US5219740 | US5312335 | WO9420078 | WO9423701 | US5383851 | US5399163 | US5399363 | US5466468 | WO9602555 | WO9606638 | US5505947 | US5520639 | US5530113 | US5543158 | US5552157 | US5565213 | US5567434 | US5580579 | WO9638591 | US5584807 | US5633234 | US5641515 | US5643576 | US5679377 | US5725871 | US5738868 | US5756353 | US5780045 | US5792451 | US5795587 | US5804212 | WO9850399 | US5843723 | US5846796 | US5856462 | US5865796 | WO9912154 | WO9920253 | US5912015 | US5916597 | WO9933488 | WO9952549 | US5989463 | US5993412 | US6008035 | US6010478 | US6015686 | US6015694 | US6113918 | WO0134617 | US6303347 | WO0190129 | WO0212258 | US6355251 | - JOHNSON ET AL., JMED CHEM, (1999), vol. 42, pages 4640 - 4649 | - ULRICH; MYERS, ULRICH; MYERS, POWELL AND NEWMAN, Vaccine Design: The Subunit and Adjuvant Approach, PLENUM, (1995), pages 495 - 524 | - SEYDEL ET AL., IMMUNOBIOL, (1993), vol. 187, no. 3-5, pages 191 - 211 | - ERWIN; MUNFORD, J BIOL CHEM, (1990), vol. 265, no. 27, pages 16444 - 16449 | - CHRIST ET AL., SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 268, pages 80 - 83 | - LIEN ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (2001), vol. 276, no. 3, pages 1873 - 1880 | - BERGE, S.M. ET AL., "Pharmaceutical Salts", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCE, (1977), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | - JOHNSON ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1999), vol. 42, pages 4640 - 4649 | - JOHNSON ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (1999), vol. 9, pages 2273 - 2278 | - PAUL, Fundamental Immunology, 3rd ed., RAVEN PRESS, (1993), pages 243 - 247 | - MARATEA ET AL., GENE, (1985), vol. 40, pages 39 - 46 | - MURPHY ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1986), vol. 83, pages 8258 - 8262 | - STOUTE ET AL., NEW ENGL. J. MED., (1997), vol. 336, pages 86 - 91 | - SKEIKY ET AL., INFECTION AND IMMUN., (1999), vol. 67, pages 3998 - 4007 | - GENE, (1986), vol. 43, pages 265 - 292 | - BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 795 - 798 | - MERRIFIELD, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1963), vol. 85, pages 2149 - 2146 | - SCHENA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1996), vol. 93, pages 10614 - 10619 | - HELLER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 2150 - 2155 | - LAGERSTROM ET AL., PCR METHODS APPLIC., (1991), vol. 1, pages 111 - 19 | - PARKER ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS. RES., (1991), vol. 19, pages 3055 - 60 | - CARUTHERS, M. H. ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES. SYMP. SER., (1980), pages 215 - 223 | - HORN, T. ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES. SYMP. SER., (1980), pages 225 - 232 | - LOGAN, J.; SHENK, T., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1984), vol. 81, pages 3655 - 3659 | - SCHARF, D. ET AL., RESULTS PROBL. CELL DIFFER., (1994), vol. 20, pages 125 - 162 | - MADDOX, D. E. ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1983), vol. 158, pages 1211 - 1216 | - LANGER, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, pages 1527 - 1533 | - SEFTON, CRC CRIT. REF. BIOMED. ENG., (1987), vol. 14, page 10 | - BUSCHWALD ET AL., SURGERY, (1980), vol. 88, page 507 | - SAUDEK ET AL., N. ENGL. J. MED., (1989), vol. 321, page 574 | - RANGER; PEPPAS, J. MACROMOL. SCI. REV. MACROL. CHEM., (1983), vol. 23, page 61 | - LEVY ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 228, page 190 | - DURING ET AL., ANN. NEUROL., (1989), vol. 25, page 51 | - HOWARD ET AL., J. NEUROSURG., (1989), vol. 7 1, page 105 | - GOODSON, Medical Applications of Controlled Release, (1984), vol. 2, pages 115 - 138 | - ROLLAND, CRIT. REV. THERAP. DRUG CARRIER SYSTEMS, (1998), vol. 15, pages 143 - 198 | - MILLER; ROSMAN, BIOTECHNIQUES, (1989), vol. 7, pages 980 - 990 | - MILLER, A. D., HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1990), vol. 1, pages 5 - 14 | - SCARPA ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1991), vol. 180, pages 849 - 852 | - BURNS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 8033 - 8037 | - BORIS-LAWRIE; TEMIN, CUR. OPIN. GENET. DEVELOP, (1993), vol. 3, pages 102 - 109 | - HAJ-AHMAD; GRAHAM, J. VIROL., (1986), vol. 57, pages 267 - 274 | - BETT ET AL., J. VIROL., (1993), vol. 67, pages 5911 - 5921 | - MITTEREDER ET AL., HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1994), vol. 5, pages 717 - 729 | - SETH ET AL., J. VIROL, (1994), vol. 68, pages 933 - 940 | - BARR ET AL., GENE THERAPY, (1994), vol. 1, pages 51 - 58 | - BERKNER, K. L., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1988), vol. 6, pages 616 - 629 | - RICH ET AL., HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1993), vol. 4, pages 461 - 476 | - LEBKOWSKI ET AL., MOLEC. CELL. BIOL., (1988), vol. 8, pages 3988 - 3996 | - VINCENT ET AL., Vaccines, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1990), vol. 90 | - CARTER, B. J., CURRENT OPINION IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 3, pages 533 - 539 | - MUZYCZKA, N., CURRENT TOPICS IN MICROBIOL. AND IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 158, pages 97 - 129 | - KOTIN, R. M., HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1994), vol. 5, pages 793 - 801 | - SHELLING; SMITH, GENE THERAPY, (1994), vol. 1, pages 165 - 169 | - ZHOU ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1994), vol. 179, pages 1867 - 1875 | - ELROY-STEIN; MOSS, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 6743 - 6747 | - FUERST ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1986), vol. 83, pages 8122 - 8126 | - MICHAEL ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1993), vol. 268, pages 6866 - 6869 | - WAGNER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 6099 - 6103 | - FISHER-HOCH ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 317 - 321 | - FLEXNER ET AL., ANN. N.Y. ACAD. SCI., (1989), vol. 569, pages 86 - 103 | - FLEXNER ET AL., VACCINE, (1990), vol. 8, pages 17 - 21 | - BERKNER, BIOTECHNIQUES, (1988), vol. 6, pages 616 - 627 | - ROSENFELD ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 252, pages 431 - 434 | - KOLLS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 215 - 219 | - KASS-EISLER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 11498 - 11502 | - GUZMAN ET AL., CIRCULATION, (1993), vol. 88, pages 2838 - 2848 | - GUZMAN ET AL., CIR. RES., (1993), vol. 73, pages 1202 - 1207 | - ULMER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 259, pages 1745 - 1749 | - COHEN, SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 259, pages 1691 - 1692 | - MOSMANN; COFFMAN, ANN. REV. IMMUNOL., (1989), vol. 7, pages 145 - 173 | - SATO ET AL., SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 273, page 352 | - MATHIOWITZ ET AL., NATURE, (19970327), vol. 386, no. 6623, pages 410 - 4 | - HWANG ET AL., CRIT REV THER DRUG CARRIER SITS, (1998), vol. 15, no. 3, pages 243 - 84 | - "pages 1035-1038 and 1570-1580", Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, 15th ed., pages 1035 - 1580 | - TAKENAGA ET AL., J CONTROLLED RELEASE, (19980302), vol. 52, no. 1-2, pages 81 - 7 | - LASIC, TRENDS BIOTECHNOL, (199807), vol. 16, no. 7, pages 307 - 21 | - TAKAKURA, NIPPON RINSHO, (199803), vol. 56, no. 3, pages 691 - 5 | - CHANDRAN ET AL., INDIAN J EXP BIOL., (199708), vol. 35, no. 8, pages 801 - 9 | - MARGALIT, CRIT REV THER DRUG CARRIER SYST., (1995), vol. 12, no. 2-3, pages 233 - 61 | - RENNEISEN ET AL., J BIOL CHEM., (19900925), vol. 265, no. 27, pages 16337 - 42 | - MULLER ET AL., DNA CELL BIOL., (199004), vol. 9, no. 3, pages 221 - 9 | - QUINTANAR-GUERRERO ET AL., DRUG DEV IND PHARM., (199812), vol. 24, no. 12, pages 1113 - 28 | - COUVREUR ET AL., CRIT REV THER DRUG CARRIER SYST., (1988), vol. 5, no. 1, pages 1 - 20 | - MUHLEN ET AL., EUR J PHARM BIOPHARM., (199803), vol. 45, no. 2, pages 149 - 55 | - ZAMBAUX ET AL., J CONTROLLED RELEASE, (19980102), vol. 50, no. 1-3, pages 31 - 40 | - JAGER ET AL., ONCOLOGY, (2001), vol. 60, no. 1, pages 1 - 7 | - RENNER ET AL., ANN HEMATOL, (200012), vol. 79, no. 12, pages 651 - 9 | - SCHREIBER, H., FUNDAMENTAL IMMUNOLOGY, (1989), pages 923 - 955 | - KEEGAN ET AL., TETRAHEDRON: ASYMMETRY, (1996), vol. 7, no. 12, pages 3559 - 3564 | - BULUSU, JMED CHEM, (1992), vol. 35, no. 19, pages 3463 - 3469 | - JIANG ET AL., TETRAHEDRON, (2002), vol. 58, no. 43, pages 8833 - 8842 | - WATANABE ET AL., CARBOHYDR RES, (2001), vol. 332, no. 3, pages 257 - 277 | - JIANG., BIOORG MED CHEM LETT, (2002), vol. 12, no. 16, pages 2193 - 2196 | - WATANABE ET AL., CARBOHYDR RES, (2001), vol. 333, no. 3, pages 203 - 231 | WO1987US00880 | WO1989US01025 | US19990158585 |