EP1590980 - PROVISION OF A MULTIMEDIA BROADCAST/MULTICAST SERVICE (MBMS) FOR A USER EQUIPMENT MOVING ALONG CELLS IN A CELLULAR MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEMING, Per Frejgatan 58 S-113 26 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
VOLTOLINA, Elena Orkanvägen 20 SE - 177 71 JÄRFÄLLA / SE | 03 /
VAN LIESHOUT, Gert-Jan Soerenseweg 40 NL-7314 CG Apeldoorn / NL | [2006/52] |
Former [2005/44] | 01 /
BEMING, Per Frejgatan 58 S-113 26 Stockholm / SE | ||
02 /
VOLTOLINA, Elena Helsingörsgatan 28 S-164 44 Kista / SE | |||
03 /
VAN LIESHOUT, Gert-Jan Soerenseweg 40 NL-7314 CG Apeldoorn / NL | Representative(s) | O'Connell, David Christopher Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | O'Connell, David Christopher HASELTINE LAKE, Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 04700443.7 | 07.01.2004 | [2005/44] | WO2004EP00050 | Priority number, date | SE20030000047 | 08.01.2003 Original published format: SE 0300047 | [2005/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004071117 | Date: | 19.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1590980 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1590980 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38 | [2005/44] | CPC: |
H04W36/12 (EP,US);
H04W36/0007 (EP,US);
H04W4/06 (EP,US);
H04W76/10 (EP,US);
H04W84/042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEREITSTELLUNG EINES MULTIMEDIA-BROADCAST-/-MULTICASTDIENSTES (MBMS) FÜR EIN SICH ENTLANG ZELLEN IN EINEM ZELLULARMOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM BEWEGENDES BENUTZERGERÄT | [2005/44] | English: | PROVISION OF A MULTIMEDIA BROADCAST/MULTICAST SERVICE (MBMS) FOR A USER EQUIPMENT MOVING ALONG CELLS IN A CELLULAR MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2005/44] | French: | FOURNITURE D'UN SERVICE DE DIFFUSION / MULTIDIFFUSION MULTIMEDIA (MBMS) A UN EQUIPEMENT D'UTILISATEUR QUI SE DEPLACE ENTRE DES CELLULES DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE CELLULAIRE | [2008/29] |
Former [2005/44] | FOURNITURE D'UN SERVICE DE DIFFUSION / MULTIDIFFUSION MULTIMEDIA (MBMS) A UN EQUIPEMENT D'UTILISATEUR DEPLACE ENTRE DES CELLULES DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE CELLULAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.05.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/44] | 15.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07007734.2 / EP1821563 | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.12.2008 | BE | 03.12.2008 | CY | 03.12.2008 | DK | 03.12.2008 | EE | 03.12.2008 | FI | 03.12.2008 | RO | 03.12.2008 | SI | 03.12.2008 | SK | 03.12.2008 | LU | 07.01.2009 | CH | 31.01.2009 | LI | 31.01.2009 | MC | 31.01.2009 | FR | 03.02.2009 | BG | 03.03.2009 | SE | 03.03.2009 | GR | 04.03.2009 | ES | 14.03.2009 | PT | 04.05.2009 | HU | 04.06.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
LU | 07.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
FR | 03.02.2009 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
HU | 04.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
LU | 07.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
FR | 03.02.2009 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
FR | 03.02.2009 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
FR | 03.02.2009 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | BE | 03.12.2008 | |
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | BE | 03.12.2008 | |
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 03.12.2008 | |
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | FI | 03.12.2008 | |
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 14.03.2009 | Cited in | International search | [E]EP1392075 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [E] 1-54 * abstract * * page 5, line 35 - page 8, line 36 * * page 9, line 35 - page 9, line 58 * * page 13, line 24 - page 14, line 2 * * page 15, line 25 - page 16, line 46 * * page 17, line 50 - page 19, line 2 ** figures 7,8,11,14A-17 *; | [XY] - 3GPP, "3rd Generation Partnership Project;Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Introduction of the Multimedia Broadcast Multicast Service (MBMS) in the Radio Access Network (Stage-2); (Release 6); 3GPP TS 25.346 V1.1.0", 3GPP TS 25.346 V1.1.0, XX, XX, (200205), pages 1 - 11, XP002260225 [X] 1 * Paragraphs 5.1.1-5.1.3 and 7.1.1-7.1.4 * [Y] 2-54 | [Y] - 3GPP, "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Radio Resource Control (RRC); Protocol Specification (Release 1999); Pages 36-43, 98-101 and 822-829", 3GPP TS 25.331 V3.12.0 TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION, (200209), URL: www.3gpp.org, (20040603), XP002283006 [Y] 2-31,38-53 * Annexes B.2, B.3.1.1 and B.3.2.3 * * figures 7.1-1 * | [YA] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project;Technical Specification Group Servivces and System Aspects; Multimedia Broadcast/Multicast Service; Architecture and Functional Description (Release 6)", 3GPP TR 23.846 2.0.0, XX, XX, (20020908), pages 1 - 114, XP002249709 [Y] 32-37,54 * Paragraphs 7.5.1.1, 7.5.1.3 and 7.5.1.4 * * figure 33 * [A] 1-31,38-53 | [XA] - HUTCHINSON 3G, "RAN Solution Proposal to Support MBMS", MBMS MEETING, London UK, 6th-7th May 2002, (20020507), pages 1 - 12, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/workshop/0205_MBMS_London/Docs/MBMS-000014, (20030729), XP002249466 [X] 32,33 * page 10 - page 11 * [A] 34-37 |