EP1588013 - MULTIPLE DISPENSING CHECK VALVE DELIVERY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.12.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRAXAIR TECHNOLOGY, INC. 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury, CT 06810-5113 / US | [2005/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEIDERMAN, Douglas, Charles 13027 Kirby Road Akron, NY 14001 / US | [2005/43] | Representative(s) | Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Bauerstraße 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/43] | Schwan - Schwan - Schorer Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04700818.0 | 08.01.2004 | [2005/43] | WO2004US00231 | Priority number, date | US20030342255 | 15.01.2003 Original published format: US 342255 | [2005/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004065750 | Date: | 05.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1588013 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E21B1/00 | [2005/43] | CPC: |
F16K1/305 (EP,US);
F17C13/04 (EP,KR,US);
F16K1/307 (EP,US);
F17C2201/0109 (EP,US);
F17C2201/0114 (EP,US);
F17C2201/032 (EP,US);
F17C2201/058 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0329 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0335 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0338 (EP,US);
F17C2205/035 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0391 (EP,US);
F17C2260/036 (EP,US);
F17C2270/0518 (EP,US);
F17C2270/0745 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7781 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT [2006/18] |
Former [2005/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRFACHABGABERÜCKSCHLAGVENTILZUFUHRSYSTEM | [2005/43] | English: | MULTIPLE DISPENSING CHECK VALVE DELIVERY SYSTEM | [2005/43] | French: | SYSTEME MULTIPLE DE DISTRIBUTION A CLAPET DE RETENUE DE DISTRIBUTION | [2005/43] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2005 | Search fee paid | 11.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/43] | 28.09.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/05] | 13.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5937895 (LE FEBRE DAVID A [US], et al); | [Y]US5033505 (EIDSMORE PAUL G [US]); | [X]US3885589 (IUNG JACQUES) |