EP1591450 - CONJUGATE FOR RETENTION IN BLOOD AND CANCER TISSUE-SPECIFIC DRUG DELIVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.09.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Astellas Pharma Inc. 3-11, Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | [2008/24] |
Former [2005/44] | For all designated states YAMANOUCHI PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD. No. 3-11 Nihonbashi-Honcho, 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAEDA, Atsushi, c/o Astellas Pharma Inc. 3-11, Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | 02 /
TAKAGI, Akira, c/o Astellas Pharma Inc. 3-11, Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | 03 /
SAITO, Katsumi, c/o Astellas Pharma Inc. 3-11, Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | 04 /
YAMASHITA, Noboru, c/o Astellas Pharma Inc. 3-11, Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | 05 /
YOSHIOKA, Tatsunobu, c/o Astellas Pharma Inc. 3-11, Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | [2005/44] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04701116.8 | 09.01.2004 | [2005/44] | WO2004JP00104 | Priority number, date | US20030439560P | 10.01.2003 Original published format: US 439560 P | [2005/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004063216 | Date: | 29.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1591450 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.07.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/06, A61K9/127, A61K47/42, A61K47/48 | [2006/20] | CPC: |
C07K7/06 (EP);
A61K47/6907 (EP);
A61K47/6911 (EP);
A61K9/1271 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
Y02P20/55 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/44] | C07K7/06, A61K9/127, A61K47/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONJUGAT FÜR RETENTION IM BLUT UND KREBSGEWEBESPEZIFISCHE WIRKSTOFFFREISETZUNG | [2005/44] | English: | CONJUGATE FOR RETENTION IN BLOOD AND CANCER TISSUE-SPECIFIC DRUG DELIVERY | [2005/44] | French: | CONJUGUE DE RETENTION DANS LE SANG ET APPORT DE MEDICAMENT SPECIFIQUE DE TISSU CANCEREUX | [2005/44] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2005 | Translation filed | 10.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2005 | Search fee paid | 10.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 10.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/44] | 17.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/42] | 25.04.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.05.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 30.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9816202 (SEQUUS PHARM INC [US]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A] - KRATZ FELIX ET AL, "Development and in vitro efficacy of novel MMP2 and MMP9 specific doxorubicin albumin conjugates", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, OXFORD, GB, (20010806), vol. 11, no. 15, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 2001 - 2006, XP002208108 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(01)00354-7 | International search | [X]WO0100247 (LIPOSOME CO INC [US]); | [X]WO9816240 (LIPOSOME CO INC [US]); | [A]WO9105546 (LIPOSOME TECHNOLOGY INC [US]); | [XP] - BAE M. ET AL., "Metalloprotease-specific poly(ethylene gycol) methyl ether-peptide-doxorubicin conjugate for targeting anticancer drug delivery based on angiogenesis", DRUG EXP. CLIN. RES., (2003), vol. 29, no. 1, pages 15 - 23, XP009063289 | [A] - MIYAZAKI KAORI ET AL., "Sosetsu matrix matalloproteinase no kozo to kino -tokuni gan no shinjun ten'i ni okeru yakuwari", SEIKAGAKU, (19961225), vol. 68, no. 12, pages 1791 - 1807, XP002980158 | [A] - MEERS P., "Enzyme-activated targeting of liposomes", ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS, (2001), vol. 53, pages 265 - 272, XP002980159 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0169-409X(01)00205-8 | Examination | - Bremer et al. (2001) Nature Med. 7, 743-748. |