EP1596961 - SAMPLE CHAMBER FOR A LIQUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2013 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ibidi GmbH Am Klopferspitz 19 82152 Martinsried / DE | [2008/23] |
Former [2005/47] | For all designated states ibidi GmbH Gründerzentrum Physik Schellingstrasse 4 80799 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAHL, Johan-Valentin Neustätterstr. 1 80636 München / DE | 02 /
ZANTL, Roman Flurweg 5a 85598 Baldham / DE | [2005/47] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/47] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04701594.6 | 13.01.2004 | [2005/47] | WO2004EP00167 | Priority number, date | DE2003100957 | 13.01.2003 Original published format: DE 10300957 | [2005/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004062773 | Date: | 29.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1596961 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1596961 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/04, B01D19/00, B01L3/00 | [2005/47] | CPC: |
B01L3/502723 (EP,US);
B01D19/0031 (EP,US);
B01L3/5027 (EP,US);
B01L3/502746 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0684 (EP,US);
B01L2300/069 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/47] | Title | German: | PROBENKAMMER FÜR EINE FLÜSSIGKEIT | [2005/47] | English: | SAMPLE CHAMBER FOR A LIQUID | [2005/47] | French: | CHAMBRE A ECHANTILLON POUR UN LIQUIDE | [2005/47] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/47] | 16.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.12.2011 | 29.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.12.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.01.2004 | CY | 27.06.2012 | CZ | 27.06.2012 | EE | 27.06.2012 | FI | 27.06.2012 | IT | 27.06.2012 | RO | 27.06.2012 | SE | 27.06.2012 | SI | 27.06.2012 | SK | 27.06.2012 | TR | 27.06.2012 | BG | 27.09.2012 | GR | 28.09.2012 | ES | 08.10.2012 | PT | 29.10.2012 | AT | 13.01.2013 | IE | 13.01.2013 | LU | 13.01.2013 | BE | 31.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
TR | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
AT | 13.01.2013 | ||
IE | 13.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
AT | 13.01.2013 | ||
IE | 13.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
IE | 13.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | EE | 27.06.2012 | |
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | FI | 27.06.2012 | |
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | FI | 27.06.2012 | |
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 27.06.2012 | |
SE | 27.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0488665 (BEND RES INC [US]) [A] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002016007 (KEEPING SEAN CRIAPLAN [GB], et al) [A] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [A]US5922604 (STAPLETON MARILYN [US], et al) [A] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [A]US3751879 (ALLINGTON R) [A] 1-29 * the whole document * | Examination | EP0787821 |