EP1585595 - A METHOD OF FORMING MULTIWELL FILTRATION PLATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMD Millipore Corporation 290 Concord Road Billerica, MA 01821 / US | [2016/16] |
Former [2012/15] | For all designated states EMD Millipore Corporation 290 Concord Road Billerica MA 01821 / US | ||
Former [2005/42] | For all designated states MILLIPORE CORPORATION John Dana Hubbard, 290 Concord Road Billerica, MA 01821 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FISHER, Bryan 43 Kernwood Ave Beverly, MA 01915 / US | [2005/42] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/16] | Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/42] | Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04701754.6 | 13.01.2004 | [2005/42] | WO2004US00785 | Priority number, date | US20030441638P | 22.01.2003 Original published format: US 441638 P | [2005/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004067176 | Date: | 12.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1585595 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1585595 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, C12M1/20, B01J19/00, B29C65/48 | [2015/48] | CPC: |
B01L3/50255 (EP,US);
B29C65/483 (EP,US);
B29C66/112 (EP);
B29C66/131 (EP);
B29C66/53461 (EP,US);
B29C66/729 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00315 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00423 (EP,US);
B01L2200/12 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0829 (EP,US);
B29C65/4815 (EP,US);
B29C65/482 (EP,US);
B29C65/4835 (EP,US);
B29C65/484 (EP,US);
B29C65/4845 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2025/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/42] | B01L3/00, C12M1/20, B01J19/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2016/16] |
Former [2006/19] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2005/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MEHRFACHLOCH-FILTRATIONSPLATTEN | [2005/42] | English: | A METHOD OF FORMING MULTIWELL FILTRATION PLATES | [2005/42] | French: | PROCEDE DE FORMATION DE PLAQUES DE FILTRATION MULTIPUITS | [2005/42] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.06.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/42] | 19.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 29.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0119502 (MILLIPORE CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * page 3, line 15 - page 3, line 27 * * page 5, line 8 - page 9, line 4 *; | [A]US2001042710 (CLARK PHILLIP [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0016] , [0017] , [0027]; figure 3 * * paragraphs [0030] - [0048] - [0057] *; | [A]WO0119505 (MILLIPORE CORP [US]) [A] 1-12 * page 6, paragraph 3 - page 7, paragraph 1; figure 3 *; | [A]WO0020117 (CENTRAL RESEARCH LAB LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 3, line 13 - page 4, line 2 *; | [A]US2002022219 (CLEMENTS JAMES G [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0012] - [0014] - [0053] , [0054] , [0067] *; | [A]WO0240158 (HERFURTH LASER TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 6, line 20 - page 7, line 10 * * claims 1-59 *; | [PX]WO03008100 (VIVASCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [PX] 1-4,6-12 * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 2, paragraph 3 * * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 4, paragraph 3 * * page 6, paragraph 4 - page 8, paragraph 1 * | by applicant | WO0119502 | WO03008100 |