EP1603844 - COATING DISPERSIONS FOR OPTICAL FIBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Walker, Christopher B., Jr. 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
Thompson, D. Scott 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
Paolucci, Dora M. 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
Brady, John T. 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2005/50] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/50] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04702568.9 | 15.01.2004 | [2005/50] | WO2004US01105 | Priority number, date | US20030386849 | 11.03.2003 Original published format: US 386849 | [2005/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004080907 | Date: | 23.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1603844 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1603844 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C03C25/10, C03C25/42, C03C25/62 | [2007/45] | CPC: |
C03C25/104 (EP,US);
C03C25/10 (KR);
C03C25/42 (KR);
C03C25/47 (EP,US);
C03C25/62 (KR);
C03C25/6226 (EP,US);
C09D183/04 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (KR);
G02B2006/02161 (EP,US);
G02B6/02395 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C09D183/04, C08L2666/54 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/50] | C03C25/10, C03C25/42, C03C25/62, C09D183/04, G02B6/16, G02B6/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESCHICHTUNGSDISPERSION FÜR OPTISCHE FASERN | [2007/15] | English: | COATING DISPERSIONS FOR OPTICAL FIBERS | [2005/50] | French: | DISPERSIONS DE REVETEMENT POUR FIBRES OPTIQUES | [2005/50] |
Former [2005/50] | BESCHICHTUNGS-DISPERSION FÜR OPTISCHE FASERN | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 02.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07110518.3 / EP1840095 | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.11.2007 | BE | 07.11.2007 | CH | 07.11.2007 | CY | 07.11.2007 | CZ | 07.11.2007 | DK | 07.11.2007 | EE | 07.11.2007 | FI | 07.11.2007 | LI | 07.11.2007 | RO | 07.11.2007 | SI | 07.11.2007 | SK | 07.11.2007 | TR | 07.11.2007 | IE | 15.01.2008 | LU | 15.01.2008 | IT | 31.01.2008 | MC | 31.01.2008 | BG | 07.02.2008 | GB | 07.02.2008 | SE | 07.02.2008 | GR | 08.02.2008 | ES | 18.02.2008 | PT | 07.04.2008 | HU | 08.05.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/38] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CY | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
TR | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 15.01.2008 | ||
LU | 15.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
GB | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
HU | 08.05.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CY | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 15.01.2008 | ||
LU | 15.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
GB | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
HU | 08.05.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CY | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 15.01.2008 | ||
LU | 15.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
GB | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CY | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 15.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
GB | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 15.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
GB | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 15.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 15.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | CH | 07.11.2007 | |
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 07.11.2007 | |
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0748883 (ABB MANAGEMENT AG [CH]) [A] 1-30 * column 2, line 40 - column 4, line 40; claims 1-18 *; | [A]US5620495 (ASPELL JENNIFER [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * column 2, lines 1-45; claims 1-5 *; | [A]WO0166484 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [A] 1-30 * page 3, line 7 - page 6, line 25 * * page 11, line 8 - page 13, line 26; claims 1-15 *; | [A]DE10028847 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-30* page 2, line 53 - page 3, line 33; claims 1-10 *; | [A] - KURITA A, "TRANSPARENT SILICONE ELASTOMERS (FOR USE IN OPTICAL FIBRES)", INTERNATIONAL POLYMER SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, RAPRA TECHNOLOGIES, SHROPSHIRE, GB, (1989), vol. 16, no. 7, ISSN 0307-174X, pages T45 - 49, XP000115430 [A] 1-30 * pages T-48, paragraph 1 - pages T-49, paragraph 4 * |