EP1586982 - MOUSE OPTICAL SIGNAL PROCESS METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2017 [2017/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhang, Hong-zhi 14/F, Block B, Fortune Plaza, 7060 Shennan Road, Futian District Shenzhen Guangdong 518040 / CN | [2005/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/42] | Representative(s) | Reinhardt, Markus, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Reinhardt Postfach 11 65 83225 Aschau / DE | [2014/08] |
Former [2013/42] | Haley, Stephen, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | ||
Former [2005/42] | Bosotti, Luciano c/o Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Srl, Via Maria Vittoria, 18 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 04702623.2 | 16.01.2004 | [2005/42] | WO2004CN00053 | Priority number, date | CN20032023054 | 20.01.2003 Original published format: CN 03223054 | CN20031014246 | 18.04.2003 Original published format: CN 03114246 | [2010/51] |
Former [2005/42] | CN20032023054 | 20.01.2003 | |
CN3114246 | 18.04.2003 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004075040 | Date: | 02.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1586982 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.09.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/033 | [2005/42] | CPC: |
G06F3/0317 (EP,US);
G06F3/0354 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MAUS-LICHTSIGNALPROZESSVERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG | [2005/42] | English: | MOUSE OPTICAL SIGNAL PROCESS METHOD AND DEVICE | [2005/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAL OPTIQUE DE SOURIS | [2005/42] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2005 | Translation filed | 18.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2005 | Search fee paid | 18.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/42] | 12.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 28.10.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/02] | 07.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/02] | Appeal following examination | 20.12.2013 | Appeal received No. T0573/14 | 24.02.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 18.11.2016 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was deemed to be withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.02.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 01.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2016 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4794384 (JACKSON STEPHEN B [US]) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 29 * * column 3, line 50 - column 6, line 63 * * column 11, line 57 - line 64 * [Y] 8; | [XY]EP0942285 (OTM TECHNOLOGIES LTD [CY]) [X] 1-3,6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraphs [0134] , [0144] * [Y] 8; | [XY]US6256016 (PIOT JULIEN [CH], et al) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * column 1, line 14 - column 3, line 10 * * column 4, line 2 - column 5, line 67 * * column 6, line 49 - column 8, line 38 * * column 9, line 24 - column 11, line 65 * * column 12, line 24 - column 16, line 13 * * column 17, line 65 - column 19, line 28 *[Y] 8 | International search | [Y]US6034670 (CHEN MEI YUN [TW]); | [A]US4967093 (TAKEMORI TAMIKI [JP]); | [A]US4794384 (JACKSON STEPHEN B [US]); | [A]GB2272763 (UNIV SHEFFIELD [GB]); | [Y] - GAO JIANXIN, ZHOU XINGENG, "Principle and applications of digital speckle correlation method", ACTA MECHANICA SINICA, (199511), vol. 27, no. 6, pages 724 - 731, XP008073076 | [A] - ZHENG WEN, "Digital phase-shifting speckle pattern interferometry system", ACTA METROLOGICA SINICA, (200007), vol. 21, no. 3, pages 167 - 172, XP008073110 | by applicant | US4794384 |