EP1591947 - LAMINATED MATERIAL WITH IMPRINTED INFORMATION, ARTICLE ON WHICH THE SAME IS ATTACHED, METHOD FOR READING INFORMATION CODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2017 [2017/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shiseido Co., Ltd. 5-5, Ginza 7-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8010 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | For all designated states Shiseido Co., Ltd. 5-5, Ginza 7-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8010 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakuma, Kenichi c/o Shiseido Research Center (Shin-Yokohama) 2-1, Hayabuchi 2-chome Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 224-8558 / JP | 02 /
Wada, Masayoshi c/o Shiseido Research Center (Shin-Yokohama) 2-1, Hayabuchi 2-chome Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 224-8558 / JP | 03 /
Kimura, Asa c/o Shiseido Research Center (Shin-Yokohama) 2-1, Hayabuchi 2-chome Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 224-8558 / JP | [2005/44] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04702847.7 | 16.01.2004 | [2005/44] | WO2004JP00327 | Priority number, date | JP20030008745 | 16.01.2003 Original published format: JP 2003008745 | JP20030053986 | 28.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003053986 | [2005/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004063978 | Date: | 29.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1591947 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.07.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/06, G06K7/12 | [2005/44] | CPC: |
G06K19/06046 (EP,US);
G06K7/10 (KR);
G06K19/16 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24364 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24372 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24612 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24876 (EP,US);
Y10T428/251 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/18] |
Former [2005/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LAMINIERTES MATERIAL MIT AUFGEDRUCKTEN INFORMATIONEN, ARTIKEL, WORAN SELBIGES ANGEBRACHT IST, VERFAHREN ZUM LESEN VON INFORMATIONSCODE | [2005/44] | English: | LAMINATED MATERIAL WITH IMPRINTED INFORMATION, ARTICLE ON WHICH THE SAME IS ATTACHED, METHOD FOR READING INFORMATION CODE | [2005/44] | French: | MATERIAU LAMINE PRESENTANT DES INFORMATIONS IMPRIMEES, ARTICLE SUR LEQUEL LEDIT MATERIAU EST FIXE, ET METHODE POUR LIRE UN CODE D'INFORMATIONS | [2005/44] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2005 | Translation filed | 29.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2005 | Search fee paid | 29.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/52] | 20.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/01] | 30.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.05.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2016 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH06139393 (OPT KK) [DA] 1* abstract *; | [X]WO0103945 (FLEX PRODUCTS INC [US]) [X] 1-9 * page 4, line 32 - page 5, line 15; figure 1a * | International search | [A]JPH01220238 (TAIYO YUDEN KK); | [A]JPH06139393 (OPT KK); | [A]JP2000081831 (SHISEIDO CO LTD); | [A]JP2000272300 (SHISEIDO CO LTD, et al) |