EP1716124 - MALEIMIDE RESIN WITH CYANURATE CORE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/20] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2006/44] | For all designated states National Starch and Chemical Investment Holding Corporation P.O. Box 7663 Wilmington Delaware 19803-7663 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUSA, Osama, M. 24 Meadowbrook Drive Hillsborough, NJ 08844 / US | [2006/44] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/46] |
Former [2006/44] | Held, Stephan, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 03 29 81630 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04702931.9 | 16.01.2004 | [2006/44] | WO2004US01192 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005077923 | Date: | 25.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1716124 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1716124 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07D251/30 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
C07D251/30 (EP,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
C07D403/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/44] | Title | German: | MALEIMIDHARZ MIT CYANURATKERN | [2006/44] | English: | MALEIMIDE RESIN WITH CYANURATE CORE | [2006/44] | French: | RESINE MALEIMIDE AVEC NOYAU A BASE DE CYANURATE | [2011/27] |
Former [2006/44] | RESINE MALEIMIDE AVEC NOYAU DE CYANURATE | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/44] | 25.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.10.2006 | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.01.2004 | AT | 14.12.2011 | BE | 14.12.2011 | CY | 14.12.2011 | CZ | 14.12.2011 | DK | 14.12.2011 | EE | 14.12.2011 | NL | 14.12.2011 | RO | 14.12.2011 | SE | 14.12.2011 | SI | 14.12.2011 | SK | 14.12.2011 | TR | 14.12.2011 | IE | 16.01.2012 | LU | 16.01.2012 | CH | 31.01.2012 | LI | 31.01.2012 | MC | 31.01.2012 | BG | 14.03.2012 | GR | 15.03.2012 | ES | 25.03.2012 | PT | 16.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 14.12.2011 | |
BE | 14.12.2011 | ||
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
TR | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 16.01.2012 | ||
LU | 16.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
ES | 25.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 14.12.2011 | |
BE | 14.12.2011 | ||
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
TR | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 16.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
ES | 25.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 14.12.2011 | |
BE | 14.12.2011 | ||
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 16.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
ES | 25.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 14.12.2011 | |
BE | 14.12.2011 | ||
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 16.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 14.12.2011 | |
BE | 14.12.2011 | ||
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/30] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | NL | 14.12.2011 | |
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9207904 (AKZO NV [NL]) [A] 1-9 * page 12, lines 14,15 *; | [X]JPH11352683 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS) [X] 1* pages 32-33; compounds 52,55,57 *; | [X]JP2001348375 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK) [X] 1 * paragraph [0069] *; | [X]JP2003040939 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS) [X] 1 * paragraph [0125] *; | [X]JP2003327662 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK) [X] 1 * paragraph [0069] *; | JP2004012671 [ ] (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS); | [E]EP1411081 (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]) [E] 1-9 * paragraph [0009]; compound (A) *; | [X] - FUJII, KEIICHI ET AL, "Spacers and liquid-crystal displays using them", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2004:32897, URL: STN, XP002298898 [X] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH11352683 | JP2001348375 | JP2003040939 | JP2003327662 | JP2004012671 | - J. BARTUS; W. L. SIMONSICK; O. VOGL, J.M.S.-PURE APPL. CHEM., (1999), vol. A36, no. 3, page 355 |