EP1588006 - DOOR ARRESTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Edscha AG Hohenhagener Strasse 26-28 42855 Remscheid / DE | [2005/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEINRICHS, Gundolf Platanenallee 133 42897 Remscheid / DE | 02 /
HOFFMANN, Peter Grosshurdener Berg 1b 51491 Overath / DE | 03 /
KRÜGER, Ute Hinter dem Anger 3 42855 Remscheid / DE | [2005/43] | Representative(s) | Sparing, Rolf Klaus, et al Bonnekamp & Sparing Patentanwältskanzlei European Patent and Trademark Law Firm Malkastenstrasse 7 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/43] | Sparing, Rolf Klaus, et al Bonnekamp & Sparing, Patentanwälte, Goltsteinstrasse 19 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 04703341.0 | 20.01.2004 | [2005/43] | WO2004DE00074 | Priority number, date | DE20031002552 | 22.01.2003 Original published format: DE 10302552 | [2005/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004065736 | Date: | 05.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1588006 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1588006 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E05C17/20 | [2005/43] | CPC: |
E05C17/203 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TÜRFESTSTELLER | [2005/43] | English: | DOOR ARRESTER | [2005/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE BLOCAGE DE PORTE | [2005/43] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/43] | 06.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.06.2006 | EE | 07.06.2006 | FI | 07.06.2006 | IE | 07.06.2006 | IT | 07.06.2006 | NL | 07.06.2006 | RO | 07.06.2006 | SI | 07.06.2006 | SK | 07.06.2006 | TR | 07.06.2006 | BG | 07.09.2006 | DK | 07.09.2006 | SE | 07.09.2006 | GR | 08.09.2006 | PT | 07.11.2006 | HU | 08.12.2006 | AT | 20.01.2007 | LU | 20.01.2007 | BE | 31.01.2007 | MC | 31.01.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/41] | CY | 07.06.2006 | |
EE | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
RO | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
BG | 07.09.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
HU | 08.12.2006 | ||
AT | 20.01.2007 | ||
LU | 20.01.2007 | ||
BE | 31.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | EE | 07.06.2006 | |
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
RO | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
BG | 07.09.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
AT | 20.01.2007 | ||
BE | 31.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/31] | FI | 07.06.2006 | |
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
RO | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
BG | 07.09.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
AT | 20.01.2007 | ||
BE | 31.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/29] | FI | 07.06.2006 | |
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
RO | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
AT | 20.01.2007 | ||
BE | 31.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | FI | 07.06.2006 | |
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
RO | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
BE | 31.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | FI | 07.06.2006 | |
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
RO | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
BE | 31.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | FI | 07.06.2006 | |
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
RO | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | FI | 07.06.2006 | |
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
RO | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | FI | 07.06.2006 | |
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | FI | 07.06.2006 | |
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | FI | 07.06.2006 | |
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | FI | 07.06.2006 | |
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | FI | 07.06.2006 | |
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 07.09.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB840603 (HAPPICH GMBH GEBR) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [A]FR2666616 (COUTIER MOULAGE GEN IND [FR]) [A] 1-46 * page 5, line 12 - page 12, line 15; figures 1-18 *; | [A]US5173991 (CARSWELL DAVID [CA]) [A] 1-46 * column 6, line 4 - column 9, line 17; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE10025185 (EDSCHA AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10062275 (EDSCHA AG [DE]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US6446305 (KNEELAND DAVID ALLEN [US]) [A] 1-46 * column 3, line 10 - column 6, line 51; figure 4 * |