EP1592669 - SUBSTITUTED 2-AMINOIMIDAZOLES, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF, THEIR USE AS A MEDICAMENT OR AS A DIAGNOSTIC REAGENT, AND MEDICAMENT CONTAINING THESE COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/45] | NOVEL SUBSTITUTED 2-AMINOIMIDAZOLES, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF, THEIR USE AS A MEDICAMENT OR AS A DIAGNOSTIC REAGENT, AND MEDICAMENT CONTAINING THESE COMPOUNDS | ||
[2007/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstraße 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEINELT, Uwe Mosbacher Strasse 54 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | 02 /
LANG, Hans-Jochen Rüdesheimer Strasse 7 65719 Hofheim / DE | 03 /
HOFMEISTER, Armin c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt / DE | 04 /
WIRTH, Klaus c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt / DE | 05 /
JANSEN, Hans-Willi Distelweg 25 65527 Niedernhausen / DE | [2007/04] |
Former [2005/45] | 01 /
HEINELT, Uwe Mosbacher Strasse 54 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
02 /
LANG, Hans-Jochen Rüdesheimer Strasse 7 65719 Hofheim / DE | |||
03 /
HOFMEISTER, Armin Pfaugasse 16 55276 Oppenheim / DE | |||
04 /
WIRTH, Klaus Robert-Schumann-Ring 104 65830 Kriftel / DE | |||
05 /
JANSEN, Hans-Willi Distelweg 25 65527 Niedernhausen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04703371.7 | 20.01.2004 | [2005/45] | WO2004EP00394 | Priority number, date | DE2003104374 | 04.02.2003 Original published format: DE 10304374 | [2005/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004069806 | Date: | 19.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1592669 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1592669 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07D233/50, C07D235/30, A61K31/4168, A61K31/4184, A61P1/10, A61P9/12, A61P11/16, A61P13/12, A61P33/02, A61P39/00 | [2005/45] | CPC: |
C07D233/50 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/10 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/16 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P3/12 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P33/02 (EP);
A61P33/06 (EP);
A61P33/14 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P39/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/08 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P7/08 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/02 (EP);
A61P9/06 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE 2-AMINOIMIDAZOLE, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG, IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS MEDIKAMENT ODER DIAGNOSTIKUM SOWIE DIESE ENTHALTENDES MEDIKAMENT | [2007/17] | English: | SUBSTITUTED 2-AMINOIMIDAZOLES, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF, THEIR USE AS A MEDICAMENT OR AS A DIAGNOSTIC REAGENT, AND MEDICAMENT CONTAINING THESE COMPOUNDS | [2007/17] | French: | 2-AMINO-IMIDAZOLES SUBSTITUES, PROCEDES DE PREPARATION CORRESPONDANTS ET UTILISATION COMME MEDICAMENT OU COMME AGENT DIAGNOSTIQUE ET MEDICAMENT LES CONTENANT | [2007/17] |
Former [2005/45] | SUBSTITUIERTE 2-AMINOIMIDAZOLE, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG, IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS MEDIKAMENT ODER DIAGNOSTIKUM SOWIE SIE ENTHALTENDES MEDIKAMENT | ||
Former [2005/45] | NOVEL SUBSTITUTED 2-AMINOIMIDAZOLES, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF, THEIR USE AS A MEDICAMENT OR AS A DIAGNOSTIC REAGENT, AND MEDICAMENT CONTAINING THESE COMPOUNDS | ||
Former [2005/45] | NOUVEAUX 2-AMINO-IMIDAZOLES SUBSTITUES, PROCEDES DE PREPARATION CORRESPONDANTS ET UTILISATION COMME MEDICAMENT OU COMME AGENT DIAGNOSTIQUE ET MEDICAMENT LES CONTENANT | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.07.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/45] | 11.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07014956.2 / EP1857445 | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.10.2007 | CZ | 17.10.2007 | DK | 17.10.2007 | EE | 17.10.2007 | FI | 17.10.2007 | IE | 17.10.2007 | NL | 17.10.2007 | RO | 17.10.2007 | SI | 17.10.2007 | SK | 17.10.2007 | TR | 17.10.2007 | BG | 17.01.2008 | SE | 17.01.2008 | GR | 18.01.2008 | AT | 20.01.2008 | LU | 20.01.2008 | ES | 28.01.2008 | BE | 31.01.2008 | CH | 31.01.2008 | IT | 31.01.2008 | LI | 31.01.2008 | MC | 31.01.2008 | PT | 17.03.2008 | HU | 18.04.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/38] | CY | 17.10.2007 | |
CZ | 17.10.2007 | ||
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
EE | 17.10.2007 | ||
FI | 17.10.2007 | ||
IE | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
RO | 17.10.2007 | ||
SI | 17.10.2007 | ||
SK | 17.10.2007 | ||
TR | 17.10.2007 | ||
BG | 17.01.2008 | ||
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
GR | 18.01.2008 | ||
AT | 20.01.2008 | ||
LU | 20.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
HU | 18.04.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 17.10.2007 | |
CZ | 17.10.2007 | ||
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
EE | 17.10.2007 | ||
FI | 17.10.2007 | ||
IE | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
RO | 17.10.2007 | ||
SI | 17.10.2007 | ||
SK | 17.10.2007 | ||
BG | 17.01.2008 | ||
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
GR | 18.01.2008 | ||
AT | 20.01.2008 | ||
LU | 20.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
HU | 18.04.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CY | 17.10.2007 | |
CZ | 17.10.2007 | ||
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
EE | 17.10.2007 | ||
FI | 17.10.2007 | ||
IE | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
RO | 17.10.2007 | ||
SI | 17.10.2007 | ||
SK | 17.10.2007 | ||
BG | 17.01.2008 | ||
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
GR | 18.01.2008 | ||
AT | 20.01.2008 | ||
LU | 20.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 17.10.2007 | |
CZ | 17.10.2007 | ||
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
EE | 17.10.2007 | ||
FI | 17.10.2007 | ||
IE | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
RO | 17.10.2007 | ||
SI | 17.10.2007 | ||
SK | 17.10.2007 | ||
BG | 17.01.2008 | ||
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
GR | 18.01.2008 | ||
AT | 20.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | CZ | 17.10.2007 | |
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
EE | 17.10.2007 | ||
FI | 17.10.2007 | ||
IE | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
RO | 17.10.2007 | ||
SI | 17.10.2007 | ||
SK | 17.10.2007 | ||
BG | 17.01.2008 | ||
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
GR | 18.01.2008 | ||
AT | 20.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 17.10.2007 | |
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
EE | 17.10.2007 | ||
FI | 17.10.2007 | ||
IE | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
RO | 17.10.2007 | ||
SI | 17.10.2007 | ||
SK | 17.10.2007 | ||
BG | 17.01.2008 | ||
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
GR | 18.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | CZ | 17.10.2007 | |
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
IE | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
RO | 17.10.2007 | ||
SI | 17.10.2007 | ||
SK | 17.10.2007 | ||
BG | 17.01.2008 | ||
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/45] | CZ | 17.10.2007 | |
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
IE | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
RO | 17.10.2007 | ||
SI | 17.10.2007 | ||
SK | 17.10.2007 | ||
BG | 17.01.2008 | ||
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | CZ | 17.10.2007 | |
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
RO | 17.10.2007 | ||
SI | 17.10.2007 | ||
SK | 17.10.2007 | ||
BG | 17.01.2008 | ||
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CZ | 17.10.2007 | |
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
SI | 17.10.2007 | ||
BG | 17.01.2008 | ||
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | NL | 17.10.2007 | |
SI | 17.10.2007 | ||
BG | 17.01.2008 | ||
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | NL | 17.10.2007 | |
BG | 17.01.2008 | ||
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4275072 (KARJALAINEN ARTO, et al) [X] 1-10,17,23 * column 1, line 18 - line 19 ** Spalte 3, Formel (II) *; | [DX]WO0246169 (AVENTIS PHARMA GMBH [DE]) [DX] 1-40 * Seite 1, Formel I * * page 22, line 14 - line 31 * |