EP2064651 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DECODING AND ANALYZING BARCODES USING A MOBILE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scanbuy, Inc. 10 East 39th Street 10th Floor New York, NY 10016 / US | [2013/51] |
Former [2009/23] | For all designated states Scanbuy, Inc. 54 West 39th Street Fourth Floor New York, NY 10018 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHRIVASTAVA, Prateek 889 Mowry ave., Apt.100 Fremont, CA 94356 / US | 02 /
ZASTEPINE, Roman 1124 Avenue Z Brooklyn, NY 11235 / US | 03 /
OUTMEZGUINE, Avi 238 6th Avenue Brooklyn, NY 11215 / US | 04 /
ATTIA, Olivier 70 Wyckoff avenue, Loft 4f Brooklyn, NY 11237 / US | [2012/45] |
Former [2009/23] | 01 /
SHRIVASTAVA, Prateek 889 Mowry ave., Apt.100 Fremont, CA 94356 / US | ||
02 /
ZASTEPINE, Roman 1124 Avenue Z Brooklyn, NY 11235 / US | |||
03 /
OUTMEZGUINE, Avi 238 6th Avenue Brooklyn, NY 11215 / US | |||
04 /
ATTIA, Olivier 70 Wyckoff avenue, Loft 4 Brooklyn, NY 11237 / US | Representative(s) | Neobard, William John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/28] | Neobard, William John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/23] | Neobard, William John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04703562.1 | 20.01.2004 | [2009/23] | WO2004US01160 | Priority number, date | US20030487237P | 16.07.2003 Original published format: US 487237 P | [2009/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005017812 | Date: | 24.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2064651 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2064651 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.02.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/10, G06K7/14, G06K17/00 | [2012/43] | CPC: |
G06K7/10881 (EP,US);
G06F16/9554 (EP,US);
G06K17/0022 (EP,US);
G06K7/10722 (EP,US);
G06K7/14 (EP,US);
H04N1/00244 (EP,US);
H04N1/00307 (EP,US);
H04N1/00326 (EP,US);
H04N1/00334 (EP,US);
H04M1/2755 (EP,US);
H04M1/72406 (EP,US);
H04M1/7243 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/23] | G06K7/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/23] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM DECODIEREN UND ANALYSIEREN VON STRICHCODES DURCH VERWENDUNG EINER MOBILEN EINRICHTUNG | [2009/23] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DECODING AND ANALYZING BARCODES USING A MOBILE DEVICE | [2009/23] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE DECODER ET D'ANALYSER DES CODES A BARRES AU MOYEN D'UN DISPOSITIF MOBILE | [2009/23] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2006 | Search fee paid | 16.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2006 | Examination requested [2009/44] | 02.10.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/25] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.02.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 14.02.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.03.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 31.07.2006 | AT   M02   Fee paid on   16.08.2006 | 31.07.2006 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   16.08.2006 | 31.07.2006 | BG   M02   Fee paid on   16.08.2006 | 31.07.2006 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   16.08.2006 | 31.07.2006 | CY   M02   Fee paid on   16.08.2006 | 31.07.2006 | CZ   M02   Fee paid on   16.08.2006 | 31.07.2006 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   16.08.2006 | 31.07.2006 | DK   M02   Fee paid on   16.08.2006 | 31.07.2006 | EE   M02   Fee paid on   16.08.2006 | 31.07.2006 | ES   M02   Fee paid on   16.08.2006 | 31.07.2006 | FI   M02   Fee paid on   16.08.2006 | 31.07.2006 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   16.08.2006 | 31.07.2006 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   16.08.2006 | 31.07.2006 | GR   M02   Fee paid on   16.08.2006 | 31.07.2006 | HU   M02   Fee paid on   16.08.2006 | 31.07.2006 | IE   M02   Fee paid on   16.08.2006 | 31.07.2006 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   16.08.2006 | 31.07.2006 | LU   M02   Fee paid on   16.08.2006 | 31.07.2006 | MC   M02   Fee paid on   16.08.2006 | 31.07.2006 | NL   M02   Fee paid on   16.08.2006 | 31.07.2006 | PT   M02   Fee paid on   16.08.2006 | 31.07.2006 | RO   M02   Fee paid on   16.08.2006 | 31.07.2006 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   16.08.2006 | 31.07.2006 | SI   M02   Fee paid on   16.08.2006 | 31.07.2006 | SK   M02   Fee paid on   16.08.2006 | 31.07.2006 | TR   M02   Fee paid on   16.08.2006 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 31.07.2006 | M02   Fee paid on   16.08.2006 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 16.02.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   16.08.2006 | 31.01.2007 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.03.2007 | 31.01.2008 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   13.02.2008 | 31.01.2010 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   15.04.2010 | 31.01.2011 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   15.02.2011 | 31.01.2012 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2012 | 31.01.2013 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   28.05.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.01.2004 | AT | 10.07.2013 | BE | 10.07.2013 | BG | 10.07.2013 | CY | 10.07.2013 | CZ | 10.07.2013 | DK | 10.07.2013 | EE | 10.07.2013 | FI | 10.07.2013 | MC | 10.07.2013 | NL | 10.07.2013 | RO | 10.07.2013 | SE | 10.07.2013 | SI | 10.07.2013 | SK | 10.07.2013 | TR | 10.07.2013 | GR | 11.10.2013 | PT | 11.11.2013 | IE | 20.01.2014 | LU | 20.01.2014 | CH | 31.01.2014 | LI | 31.01.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 20.01.2004 | |
AT | 10.07.2013 | ||
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
IE | 20.01.2014 | ||
LU | 20.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
IE | 20.01.2014 | ||
LU | 20.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
IE | 20.01.2014 | ||
LU | 20.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
LU | 20.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
LU | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | SI | 10.07.2013 | |
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | SI | 10.07.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5523552 (SHELLHAMMER STEPHEN J [US], et al) [Y] 4-6,8* column 4, line 34 - column 10, line 31 *; | [XY]GB2354360 (ROKE MANOR RESEARCH [GB]) [X] 1-3,7,9-14 * page 1 - page 7 * [Y] 4-6,8; | [X]WO0197105 (ACCENTURE PROPERTIES 2 BV [NL], et al) [X] 1-3,11,12 * page 4, line 5 - page 10, line 12 *; | [X]WO0215119 (GAVITEC GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,10 * page 1, line 5 - line 20 * * page 5, line 1 - page 7, line 18 * * page 17, line 9 - line 19 * * page 19, line 3 - line 8 *; | [X]EP1182604 (SETRIX AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,9 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0058] *; | [X]GB2383231 (HENDY JEREMY PHILIP [GB]) [X] 1-3 * page 1 - page 3 * | International search | [X]US6123261 (ROUSTAEI ALEXANDER R [US]); | [X]US6561428 (MEIER TIMOTHY P [US], et al) | Examination | US5949054 | US6006990 | by applicant | GB2354360 | EP1182604 | GB2383231 |