EP1593196 - GEAR UNIT AND AMBIDEXTROUS ELECTRIC WINDOW LIFT MOTOR WITH SAID GEAR UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/45] | AMBIDEXTROUS ELECTRIC WINDOW LIFT MOTOR | ||
[2009/32] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.07.2010 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens VDO Automotive Corporation 2400 Executive Hills Drive Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2980 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states Siemens VDO Automotive Corporation 2400 Executive Hills Drive Auburn Hills Michigan 48326-2980 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OH, Jon Yeon 700 Wood Branch Trail Suwanee, Georgia 30024 / US | 02 /
ANDERSON, Barry 547 Streamwood Ivy Trail Suwanee, Georgia 30024 / US | 03 /
BASS, Martin Stoehrstr. 26 97402 Wuerzburg / DE | [2005/45] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Michael Continental Automotive GmbH Patentabteilung Lilienthalstrasse 15 85579 Neubiberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/49] | Fischer, Michael Continental Automotive GmbH Patentabteilung Lilienthalstrasse 15 85579 Neubiberg / DE | ||
Former [2008/40] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichtstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | Fischer, Michael Continental Automotive GmbH Postfach 22 16 39 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/45] | Payne, Janice Julia Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04703653.8 | 20.01.2004 | [2005/45] | WO2004US01418 | Priority number, date | US20030446315P | 10.02.2003 Original published format: US 446315 P | US20030379961 | 05.03.2003 Original published format: US 379961 | [2005/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004073153 | Date: | 26.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1593196 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02P1/00 | [2005/45] | CPC: |
F16H57/039 (EP,US);
H02K7/116 (KR);
E05F15/697 (EP,US);
H02K7/1166 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/55 (EP,US);
F16H1/16 (EP,US);
F16H2057/02034 (EP,US);
F16H2057/0235 (EP,US);
Y10T74/18568 (EP,US);
Y10T74/18664 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GETRIEBEEINHEIT UND BILATERALER ELEKTRISCHER FENSTERHEBERMOTOR MIT DER GETRIEBEEINHEIT | [2009/32] | English: | GEAR UNIT AND AMBIDEXTROUS ELECTRIC WINDOW LIFT MOTOR WITH SAID GEAR UNIT | [2009/32] | French: | TRANSMISSION A ENGRENAGES ET MOTEUR ELECTRIQUE DE LEVE-GLACE POUR LES COTES DROIT ET GAUCHE COMPRENANT LADITE TRANSMISSION | [2009/32] |
Former [2005/45] | BILATERALER ELEKTRISCHER FENSTERHEBERMOTOR | ||
Former [2005/45] | AMBIDEXTROUS ELECTRIC WINDOW LIFT MOTOR | ||
Former [2005/45] | MOTEUR ELECTRIQUE DE LEVE-GLACE POUR LES COTES DROIT ET GAUCHE | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/45] | 01.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/32] | 25.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE19819996 (VALEO KLIMASYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,9,10,13-16 * column 5, line 31 - line 58; figure 1 * [Y] 7,8; | [X]GB2040389 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG) [X] 9-11,13-16 * page 2, line 89 - line 93; figures 1,3 *; | [Y]US5836219 (KLINGLER PETER [DE], et al) [Y] 7,8 * abstract *; | [A]US5307704 (MUELLER KARLHEINZ [DE], et al) [A] 3 * column 3, line 19 - line 21 * |