EP1592790 - ELECTROMAGNETIC ACTIVATION OF GENE EXPRESSION AND CELL GROWTH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Regenesis Biomedical, Inc. 1435 North Hayden Road Scottsdale, AZ 85257-3773 / US | [2005/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEORGE, Frank, R. 4636 E. Moonlight Way Paradise Valley, AZ 85253 / US | 02 /
MOFFETT, John 2240 North Edgemere Street Phoenix, AZ 85006 / US | [2005/45] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2005/45] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04704094.4 | 21.01.2004 | [2005/45] | WO2004US01694 | Priority number, date | US20030350313 | 22.01.2003 Original published format: US 350313 | [2005/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004065564 | Date: | 05.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1592790 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.02.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/00, C12N15/09, A61N5/00 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
A61N5/00 (EP,US);
A61N1/00 (US);
C12N13/00 (EP,US);
A61N1/40 (EP);
C12N2529/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/45] | C12N15/00, C12N15/09 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROMAGNETISCHE AKTIVIERUNG VON GENEXPRESSION UND ZELLWACHSTUM | [2005/45] | English: | ELECTROMAGNETIC ACTIVATION OF GENE EXPRESSION AND CELL GROWTH | [2005/45] | French: | ACTIVATION ELECTROMAGNETIQUE D'EXPRESSION GENETIQUE ET DE CROISSANCE CELLULAIRE | [2005/45] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2005 | Search fee paid | 22.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/45] | 31.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/04] | 06.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.03.2006 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 27.10.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 27.10.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.11.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.07.2006 | 31.01.2012 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9823329 (LUBART RACHEL [IL]) [X] 1-29,34-37,40,41,43-49 * page 4 - page 5; example 1 *; | [X]US6353763 (GEORGE FRANK R [US], et al) [X] 1-62 * columns 9-10 * * columns 18-20 *; | [PA]US2003181962 (STREETER JACKSON [US]) [PA] * page 3 - page 5; claim - *; | [X] - GILBERT T L ET AL, "The Provant(R) wound closure system induces activation of p44/42 MAP kinase in normal cultured human fibroblasts", ANNALS OF THE NEW YORK ACADEMY OF SCIENCES 2002 UNITED STATES, (2002), vol. 961, ISSN 0077-8923, pages 168 - 171, XP002357987 [X] 1-28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1749-6632.2002.tb03076.x | [X] - GEORGE FRANK R. ET AL, "In-Vitro Mechanisms of Cell Proliferation Induction: A Novel Bioactive Treatment for Accelerating Wound Healing", WOUNDS, (2002), pages 1 - 7, URL: http://www.medscape.com/viewarticle/433376_print, (20051208), XP002357988 [X] 1-28 * the whole document * | [X] - SHEFER G ET AL, "Skeletal muscle cell activation by low-energy laser irradiation: A role for the MAPK/ERK pathway", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR PHYSIOLOGY 2001 UNITED STATES, (2001), vol. 187, no. 1, ISSN 0021-9541, pages 73 - 80, XP002357989 [X] 1-28 * page 75 - page 76; figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1097-4652(2001)9999:9999<::AID-JCP1053>3.0.CO;2-9 | [X] - BEN-DOV N ET AL, "Low-energy laser irradiation affects satellite cell proliferation and differentiation in vitro.", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA. 11 JAN 1999, (19990111), vol. 1448, no. 3, ISSN 0006-3002, pages 372 - 380, XP002357990 [X] 1-28 * page 373 - page 377; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-4889(98)00147-5 | [X] - OZAWA Y ET AL, "Low-energy laser irradiation stimulates bone nodule formation at early stages of cell culture in rat calvarial cells.", BONE. APR 1998, (199804), vol. 22, no. 4, ISSN 8756-3282, pages 347 - 354, XP002357991 [X] 1-28 * page 349 - page 352; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S8756-3282(97)00294-9 | [ ] - GEORGE FRANK R. ET AL., "In-Vitro Mechanisms of Cell Proliferation Induction: A Novel Bioactive Treatment for Accelerating Wound Healing", WOUNDS, ISSN: 1044-7946, (2002), vol. 14, no. 3, pages 107 - 115 | International search | [X]US6334069 (GEORGE FRANK R [US], et al); | [A]US2002177885 (EISFELD TIMOTHY M [US], et al); | [AE]US2004014052 (KURTZ WARREN H [US], et al) |