EP1587603 - IMPROVED CONFIGURATION AND PROCESS FOR CARBONYL REMOVAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FLUOR CORPORATION 3 Polaris Way Aliso Viejo, CA 92698 / US | [2006/30] |
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states FLUOR CORPORATION One Enterprise Drive Aliso Viejo, CA 92656 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAVIKUMAR, Ravi, Fluor Corporation Engineering Building, One Fluor Daniel Drive Aliso Viejo, CA 92656 / US | [2005/43] | Representative(s) | Dr. Graf & Partner AG Intellectual Property Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / SG / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Dr. Graf & Partner Intellectual Property Herrenacker 15 Postfach 518 8201 Schaffhausen / CH | ||
Former [2005/43] | Dr. Graf & Partner Intellectual Property Herrenacker 15 Postfach 518 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | Application number, filing date | 04704132.2 | 21.01.2004 | [2005/43] | WO2004US01796 | Priority number, date | WO2003US02696 | 28.01.2003 Original published format: PCT/US0302/696 | [2005/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004069749 | Date: | 19.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1587603 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.01.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/02 | [2005/43] | CPC: |
C10K1/007 (EP,US);
B01D53/02 (EP,US);
B01J20/02 (EP,US);
B01J20/10 (EP,US);
B01J20/18 (EP,US);
B01J20/20 (EP,US);
B01J20/3078 (EP,US);
C10K1/205 (EP,US);
C10K1/32 (EP,US);
F01D25/007 (EP,US);
F02C3/22 (EP,US);
F02C7/30 (EP,US);
B01D2253/112 (EP,US);
B01D2257/308 (EP,US);
Y02E20/16 (EP,US);
Y02E20/18 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE KONFIGURATION UND VERBESSERTES VERFAHREN ZUM ENTFERNEN VON CARBONYL | [2005/43] | English: | IMPROVED CONFIGURATION AND PROCESS FOR CARBONYL REMOVAL | [2005/43] | French: | CONFIGURATION AMELIOREE ET PROCEDE D'ELIMINATION DE CARBONYLE | [2005/43] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2005 | Search fee paid | 22.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/43] | 20.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/01] | 30.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.11.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2016 | 13   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.2016 | 31.01.2017 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US4740361 (HEYD ROBERT L [US], et al); | [A]US5008160 (JENKIN WILLIAM C [US]); | [X]US5145716 (PASERIN VLADIMIRI [CA], et al); | [A]US5451384 (CARR NORMAN L [US]); | [A]US6077487 (SNOW JAMES T [US]); | [A]US6165428 (EIJKHOUDT ROGER [NL], et al) | Examination | US4134451 | US5197993 |