EP1587547 - AMYLOID-BINDING, METAL-CHELATING AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2008 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE GENERAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION 55 Fruit Street Boston, MA 02114 / US | [2005/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Xudong 11 Patricia Circle Andover, MA 01810 / US | [2005/52] |
Former [2005/43] | 01 /
HUANG, Xudong Boston, MA / US | Representative(s) | Gambell, Derek Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/43] | Gambell, Derek Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04704402.9 | 22.01.2004 | [2005/43] | WO2004US01669 | Priority number, date | US20030441719P | 22.01.2003 Original published format: US 441719 P | [2005/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004064869 | Date: | 05.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1587547 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K49/10, A61K51/04, A61K31/425, A61P25/28 | [2005/43] | CPC: |
A61K31/425 (EP,US);
A61K49/0002 (EP,US);
A61K49/0004 (EP,US);
A61K49/085 (EP,US);
A61K49/10 (EP,US);
A61K49/103 (EP,US);
A61K51/0478 (EP,US);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AMYLOID-BINDUNG, METALLCHELAT-BILDNER | [2005/43] | English: | AMYLOID-BINDING, METAL-CHELATING AGENTS | [2005/43] | French: | AGENT DE CHELATION METALLIQUE, A LIAISON AMYLOIDE | [2005/43] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.08.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/46] | 24.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/47] | 02.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO02085903 (KUNG HANK [US], et al) [X] 1,6,7,34,46,47,51,56,57,59,60,65,66 * claims 8,17,23,24 * * page 7, paragraph 20 * * page 30, paragraph 78 * * page 32, paragraph 86 * * page 33, paragraph 90 *; | [X]WO9741856 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [X] 16-18,20,22,27-29,40,41,43,67-84,90-95 * claims 1,24 *; | [X]WO0228441 (CALIFORNIA INST OF TECHN [US]) [X] 16-18,20-22,24-26,40,41,67-87,90-95 * claims 1,6,8,11,12 * * page 7, line 16 - line 26 *; | [A]EP0681844 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [A] * claims * | [A] - KLUNK W E ET AL, "Uncharged thioflavin-T derivatives bind to amyloid-beta protein with high affinity and readily enter the brain", LIFE SCIENCES, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (20010817), vol. 69, no. 13, ISSN 0024-3205, pages 1471 - 1484, XP002189042 [A] * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0024-3205(01)01232-2 | [A] - DEZUTTER N A ET AL, "99mTc-MAMA-chrysamine G, a probe for beta-amyloid protein of Alzheimer's disease", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, BERLIN, DE, (199911), vol. 26, no. 11, ISSN 0340-6997, pages 1392 - 1399, XP002193810 [A] * abstract * * page 1393, column L, paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s002590050470 | [A] - WANG YANMING ET AL, "Synthesis and evaluation of 2-(3'-iodo-4'-aminophenyl)-6-hydroxybenzo thiazole for in vivo quantitation of amyloid deposits in Alzheimer's disease", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR NEUROSCIENCE, (200208), vol. 19, no. 1-2, ISSN 0895-8696, pages 11 - 16, XP008031471 [A] * page 15, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 15, column R, paragraph 2 * | [A] - WANG YANMING ET AL, "Synthesis and 11C-labelling of (E,E)-1-(3',4'-dihydroxystyryl)-4-(3'- methoxy-4'-hydroxystyryl) benzene for PET imaging of amyloid deposits", JOURNAL OF LABELLED COMPOUNDS AND RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS, (200207), vol. 45, no. 8, ISSN 0362-4803, pages 647 - 664, XP002284024 [A] * page 653, paragraph 2 * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jlcr.585 | [A] - BACSKAI BRIAN J ET AL, "Imaging amyloid-beta deposits in vivo", JOURNAL OF CEREBRAL BLOOD FLOW AND METABOLISM, (200209), vol. 22, no. 9, ISSN 0271-678X, pages 1035 - 1041, XP008031462 [A] * page 1038, column L, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00004647-200209000-00001 | [X] - ZHEN WEIGUO ET AL, "Synthesis and amyloid binding properties of rhenium complexes: Preliminary progress toward a reagent for SPECT imaging of Alzheimer's disease brain", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (19990729), vol. 42, no. 15, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 2805 - 2815, XP002310402 [X] 16-18,20,27-29,40,41,43,67-84,90-95 * page 2805, abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm990103w | [X] - PODUSLO JOSEPH F ET AL, "Molecular targeting of Alzheimer's amyloid plaques for contrast-enhanced magnetic resonance imaging.", NEUROBIOLOGY OF DISEASE, (200211), vol. 11, no. 2, ISSN 0969-9961, pages 315 - 329, XP002310403 [X] 16-18,20,22,24-26,40,41,67-87,90-95 * page 315, abstract * |