EP1586058 - SEARCHING APPARATUS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.05.2009 [2009/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/42] | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUCATEL, Gery, Michel 40 Cecil Road Ipswich Suffolk IP1 3NW / GB | 02 /
AZVINE, Behnam 6 Dodson Vale Ipswich Suffolk IP5 2GT / GB | [2005/42] | Representative(s) | Geffen, Nigel Paul BT Intellectual Property Department Ground Floor BT Faraday Building 1 Knightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/42] | Geffen, Nigel Paul BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department, PP C5A BT Centre 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04704667.7 | 23.01.2004 | [2005/42] | WO2004GB00310 | Priority number, date | GB20030001721 | 24.01.2003 Original published format: GB 0301721 | GB20030009460 | 25.04.2003 Original published format: GB 0309460 | [2005/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004066163 | Date: | 05.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1586058 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2005/42] | CPC: |
G06F16/9535 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/20] |
Former [2005/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SUCHAPPARATEN UND METHODEN | [2005/42] | English: | SEARCHING APPARATUS AND METHODS | [2005/42] | French: | DISPOSITIFS ET PROCEDES DE RECHERCHE | [2005/42] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/42] | 06.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/22] | 13.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO0077689 (TRIOGO INC [US]) [X] 1-4,8-13,18-20,22-24,29-31,36,37 * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 11 * * page 10, line 10 - page 14, line 8 * * page 14, line 9 - page 17, line 25 * * page 18, line 1 - page 21, line 11 * * page 21, line 13 - page 26, line 10 * * Profile management and adding of resource relevance to profiles.;; figures 1,2 * [Y] 5-7,14-17,21,25-28,32-35; | [A]US6256633 (DHARAP CHANDA [US]) [A] 1-37* the whole document *; | [AY]US2002042793 (CHOI JUN-HYEOG [KR]) [A] 1-4,8-13,18-20,22-24,29-31,36,37 * page 2, paragraph 23 - paragraph 30 * * page 3, paragraph 50 - page 4, paragraph 69 * * page 5, paragraph 79 - page 6, paragraph 93 * * page 6 * * page 6, paragraph 99 - page 8, paragraph 125 * * page 9, paragraph 151 - page 12, paragraph 198 * * Clustering methods with fuzzy sets, SOM (Self Organising Maps) and Kohonen method for order ranking.;; figures 1-4,8 * [Y] 5-7,14-17,21,25-28,32-35; | [A] - LAGUS K, "Text retrieval using self-organized document maps", NEURAL PROCESS. LETT. (NETHERLANDS), NEURAL PROCESSING LETTERS, FEB. 2002, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, NETHERLANDS, (200202), vol. 15, no. 1, ISSN 1370-4621, pages 21 - 29, XP002286398 [A] 1-37 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1013853012954 | [A] - RONG JIN ET AL, "Meta-scoring: automatically evaluating term weighting schemes in IR without precision-recall", SIGIR FORUM (USA), SIGIR FORUM, 2001, ACM, USA, (2001), vol. spec. issue., ISSN 0163-5840, pages 83 - 89, XP002286399 [A] 1-37 * the whole document * | Examination | - UNDERWOOD G M; MAGLIO P P; BARRETT R, "User-centered push for timely information delivery", COMPUTER NETOWRKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS, SAN JOSE, CA, USA, (19980401), XP004121442 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0169-7552(98)00083-X | - CHEN H; LYNCH K J, "Automatic construction of networks of concepts characterizing document databases", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SYSTEMS, MAN AND CYBERNETICS, NEW YORK, US, (19920201), pages 885 - 902, XP002346200 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/21.179830 |