EP1594570 - DEFIBRILLATION SYSTEM FOR NON-MEDICAL ENVIRONMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2008 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cardiac Telecom Corporation RD 12, Box 177, Donohoe Road Greensburg, PA 15601 / US | [2005/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANGER, Alois, A. 600 Woodside Road Pittsburgh, PA 15221 / US | [2005/46] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB, et al Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/46] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät, et al Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04704923.4 | 23.01.2004 | [2005/46] | WO2004US01999 | Priority number, date | US20030442330P | 27.01.2003 Original published format: US 442330 P | [2005/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004067083 | Date: | 12.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1594570 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/39 | [2005/46] | CPC: |
A61N1/3904 (EP,US);
A61B5/0022 (US);
A61B5/746 (US);
G16H40/63 (EP,US);
A61N1/36514 (EP,US);
A61N1/37258 (EP,US);
A61N1/3993 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DEFIBRILLATIONSSYSTEM FÜR NICHTMEDIZINISCHE UMGEBUNG | [2005/46] | English: | DEFIBRILLATION SYSTEM FOR NON-MEDICAL ENVIRONMENTS | [2005/46] | French: | SYSTEME DE DEFIBRILLATION DESTINE A DES MILIEUX NON MEDICAUX | [2005/46] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2005 | Search fee paid | 24.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/46] | 01.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/08] | 11.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5782878 (MORGAN CARLTON B [US], et al); | [XP]US6553256 (JORGENSON DAWN BLILIE [US], et al) |