EP1590427 - WASHING AGENT AND FABRIC SOFTENER FORMULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | [2005/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAISS, Elke Totenbühlstrasse 5 79730 Murg / DE | 02 /
ILTIS, Laure rue des Blés 8 F-68360 Soultz / FR | 03 /
KVITA, Petr Binningerstrasse 4D CH-4153 Reinach / CH | 04 /
MENGE, Ullrich Schlossgasse 45 79639 Grenzach-Wyhlen / DE | [2005/44] | Application number, filing date | 04705400.2 | 27.01.2004 | [2005/44] | WO2004EP00675 | Priority number, date | EP20030405051 | 03.02.2003 Original published format: EP 03405051 | [2005/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004069981 | Date: | 19.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1590427 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C11D17/00, C11D17/06 | [2005/44] | CPC: |
C11D17/06 (EP,US);
C11D3/382 (KR);
C11D17/0034 (EP,US);
C11D3/001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASCHMITTEL- UND WEICHSPÜLERFORMULIERUNGEN | [2005/44] | English: | WASHING AGENT AND FABRIC SOFTENER FORMULATIONS | [2005/44] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DETERGENTES ET ADOUCISSANTES | [2005/44] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/44] | 29.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/37] | 24.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1106678 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-3,6-11,14-17,20-22,25-27 * paragraphs [0010] , [0018] , [0019]; claims 1-3 *; | [X]DE19601841 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-3,7-11,15,16,20-22,26 * claim - *; | [X]DD252842 (PIESTERITZ AGROCHEMIE [DD]) [X] 1-4,6-12,14,15 * example -; claim 1 *; | [X]US4440661 (TAKEUCHI SHOJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,7-11 * column 4, line 1 - line 16; claim -; table 1 *; | [X]FR2515682 (JEZEQUEL RONAN [FR]) [X] 1-3,5-11,13-16,20-26 * page 4, line 9 - line 26; claim - *; | [X]EP0094250 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11,13-18,20-22,24-27 * page 4, line 18 - line 32; examples 1,2 *; | [A]US4615814 (WINETZKY DEBORAH [US]) [A] 1,19 * claims 1,23 * |