EP1494188 - ABNORMALITY DETECTION DEVICE AND INFORMATION APPARATUS USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIGASHIYAMA, Seiji, c/o Matsushita El. Ind. Co., Ltd. IPROC, 7F Twin 21, OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 02 /
NAKAJIMA, Yuji, c/o Matsushita El. Ind. Co., Ltd. IPROC, 7F Twin 21, OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 03 /
IKOMA, Ken, Matsushita El. Ind. Co., Ltd. IPROC 7F Twin 21, OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | [2008/38] |
Former [2005/01] | 01 /
HIGASHIYAMA, Seiji Osaka / JP | ||
02 /
NAKAJIMA, Yuji Osaka / JP | |||
03 /
IKOMA, Ken Osaka / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04705494.5 | 27.01.2004 | [2005/01] | WO2004JP00697 | Priority number, date | JP20030021847 | 30.01.2003 Original published format: JP 2003021847 | JP20030041127 | 19.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003041127 | [2005/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004068431 | Date: | 12.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1494188 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1494188 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.08.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/22 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
G08B13/1409 (EP,US);
G06F21/86 (EP,US);
G08B13/126 (EP,US);
G08B29/046 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/20] |
Former [2005/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABWEICHUNGSDETEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG UND INFORMATIONSGERÄT MIT VERWENDUNG DERSELBEN | [2005/01] | English: | ABNORMALITY DETECTION DEVICE AND INFORMATION APPARATUS USING THE SAME | [2005/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DETECTION D'ANOMALIES ET APPAREIL D'INFORMATION UTILISANT UN TEL DISPOSITIF | [2005/01] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2004 | Translation filed | 12.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/01] | 26.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2298144 (AGOSTINI SA [FR]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0786751 (GRUNDIG AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]EP0955616 (HI G TEK LTD [IL]) [A] 11,12* abstract *; | [A]EP1174839 (VIMAR SPA [IT]) [A] 1-10,13-16 * abstract * * column 4, line 10 - line 58 * * figure 2 * | International search | [X]JPH10116393 (KUBOTA KK); | [Y]JPH09212754 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [Y]JPS4898084U |