EP1603790 - INTERCONNECTABLE PROFILED ELEMENTS, IN PARTICULAR FOR PANEL-TYPE STRUCTURAL COMPONENTS OF MOTOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.2006 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.11.2006 [2006/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [2005/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURZER, Jörg Badbrunnenstr. 24 70374 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
FUSSNEGGER, Wolfgang Käthe-Kollwitz-Strasse 12 72074 Tübingen / DE | 03 /
HIERMER, Tobias Pfadstrasse 14 71069 Sindelfingen / DE | 04 /
JOST, Reiner Tulpenstrasse 6 75365 Calw / DE | [2005/50] | Application number, filing date | 04705796.3 | 28.01.2004 | [2005/50] | WO2004EP00728 | Priority number, date | DE2003111764 | 18.03.2003 Original published format: DE 10311764 | [2005/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004083021 | Date: | 30.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1603790 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B62D33/04, F16B5/00 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
B62D33/046 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2006/25] |
Former [2005/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MITEINANDER VERBINDBARE PROFILELEMENTE, INSBESONDERE FÜR PLATTENFÖRMIGE KRAFTFAHRZEUG-STRUKTURBAUTEILE | [2005/50] | English: | INTERCONNECTABLE PROFILED ELEMENTS, IN PARTICULAR FOR PANEL-TYPE STRUCTURAL COMPONENTS OF MOTOR VEHICLES | [2005/50] | French: | ELEMENTS PROFILES POUVANT ETRE ASSEMBLES LES UNS AUX AUTRES, DESTINES NOTAMMENT A DES ELEMENTS DE STRUCTURE, EN FORME DE PANNEAUX, DE VEHICULES AUTOMOBILES | [2005/50] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 17.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/47] | 28.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE8817152U (KRAUSS-MAFFEI AG) [X] 1* figure 3; claims 1,5,6 *; | [X]WO9607801 (INMAN BARRY [GB], et al) [X] 1 * figure 2a * * page 8, line 8 - page 9, line 6 *; | [XY]US5664826 (WILKENS ARTHUR L [US]) [X] 1 * figures 3,4 * * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 23 * [Y] 2; | [Y]WO0009384 (ALUSUISSE LONZA SERVICES AG [CH]) [Y] 2 * column A * | by applicant | DE19712316 | DE19917177 |