EP1590605 - KITCHEN STOVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.12.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.01.2007 [2007/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Multibrás S.A. Eletrodomésticos Avenida das Nações Unidas, 12995, 32 , andar CEP-04578-000 São Paulo - SP / BR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | For all designated states Multibras S.A. Eletrodomésticos Avenida das Naçoes Unidas, 12995, 32, andar CEP-04578-000 Sao Paulo, SP / BR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALCÂNTARA FILHO, Guilherme Moreira de Rua Bernardino Iatauro, 200 82310-380 Curitiba - PR / BR | [2005/44] | Representative(s) | Held, Stephan, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | Held, Stephan, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 03 29 81630 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04706101.5 | 29.01.2004 | [2005/44] | WO2004BR00004 | Priority number, date | BR20030300342 | 03.02.2003 Original published format: BR 0300342 | [2005/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004070278 | Date: | 19.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1590605 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F24C15/08 | [2005/44] | CPC: |
F24C15/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | GB [2006/21] |
Former [2005/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÜCHENHERD | [2005/44] | English: | KITCHEN STOVE | [2005/44] | French: | CUISINIERE | [2005/44] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/44] | 13.10.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/04] | 06.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/04] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB610717 (HERBERT OLIVER PUSEY; ORME EVANS AND COMPANY LTD) [X] 1-6,10,12,13 * page 4, line 117 - page 6, line 1; figures 1-3 *; | [X]GB553799 (DOUGLAS HENRY OTTON; TURLEY & WILLIAMS LTD; CHARLES DONALD SMITH) [X] 1-4,6-8,10,12,13 * page 3, lines 1-61; figures 1,2,5,6 *; | [X]GB597424 (WALTER RATLEDGE TWIGG; WILLIAM LAWRENCE STRINGER; RADIATION LTD) [X] 1,2,6,10,12,13 * page 2, line 55 - page 3, line 19; figures 1,2 *; | [X]CH234564 (JUNKERS & CO) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB620438 (WALTER RATLEDGE TWIGG; RADIATION LTD) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]GB817518 (SIMPLEX ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 7 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE458920 (ASKANIA WERKE AG; CARL BAMBERG FRIEDENAU) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]GB236969 (GEORGE HELPS) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]FR2078800 (ZANUSSI A SPA INDUSTRIE) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]GB2346438 (STOVES GROUP PLC) [A] * the whole document * |