EP1589892 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CAPTURING INFORMATION ASSOCIATED WITH A SURGICAL PROCEDURE PERFORMED USING A LOCALIZATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aesculap AG Am Aesculap-Platz 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | [2008/38] |
Former [2008/01] | For all designated states AESCULAP AG & Co. KG Am Aesculap-Platz 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | ||
Former [2005/44] | For all designated states Aesculap AG & Co. KG Am Aesculap-Platz 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEITNER, François L'Orée du Parc F-38410 Uriage / FR | 02 /
REUTER, Christoph, Georg Haselweg 3 78573 Wurmlingen / DE | [2005/44] | Representative(s) | Boehme, Ulrich HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | Boehme, Ulrich HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 04706167.6 | 29.01.2004 | [2005/44] | WO2004EP00778 | Priority number, date | US20030357908 | 04.02.2003 Original published format: US 357908 | [2005/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004069074 | Date: | 19.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1589892 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1589892 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61B19/00 | [2005/44] | CPC: |
A61B5/064 (EP,US);
A61B34/20 (EP,US);
A61B1/313 (EP,US);
A61B17/154 (EP,US);
A61B17/155 (EP,US);
A61B17/157 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2055 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2068 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2072 (EP,US);
A61B2090/373 (EP,US);
A61B34/10 (EP,US);
A61B90/361 (EP,US);
A61B90/37 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR AUFZEICHNUNG VON INFORMATIONEN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT EINEM CHIRURGISCHEN EINGRIFF MIT EINER LOKALISIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2005/44] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CAPTURING INFORMATION ASSOCIATED WITH A SURGICAL PROCEDURE PERFORMED USING A LOCALIZATION DEVICE | [2005/44] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DESTINES A CAPTURER DES INFORMATIONS ASSOCIEES A UNE PROCEDURE CHIRURGICALE REALISEE AU MOYEN D'UN DISPOSITIF DE LOCALISATION | [2005/44] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/44] | 25.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 28.11.2007 | CY | 28.11.2007 | CZ | 28.11.2007 | DK | 28.11.2007 | EE | 28.11.2007 | FI | 28.11.2007 | NL | 28.11.2007 | RO | 28.11.2007 | SI | 28.11.2007 | SK | 28.11.2007 | TR | 28.11.2007 | IE | 29.01.2008 | LU | 29.01.2008 | MC | 31.01.2008 | BG | 28.02.2008 | SE | 28.02.2008 | GR | 29.02.2008 | PT | 28.04.2008 | HU | 29.05.2008 | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/34] | BE | 28.11.2007 | |
CY | 28.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2007 | ||
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
EE | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
RO | 28.11.2007 | ||
SI | 28.11.2007 | ||
SK | 28.11.2007 | ||
IE | 29.01.2008 | ||
LU | 29.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 28.02.2008 | ||
GR | 29.02.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
HU | 29.05.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | BE | 28.11.2007 | |
CY | 28.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2007 | ||
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
EE | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
RO | 28.11.2007 | ||
SI | 28.11.2007 | ||
SK | 28.11.2007 | ||
IE | 29.01.2008 | ||
LU | 29.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 28.02.2008 | ||
GR | 29.02.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | BE | 28.11.2007 | |
CY | 28.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2007 | ||
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
EE | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
RO | 28.11.2007 | ||
SI | 28.11.2007 | ||
SK | 28.11.2007 | ||
IE | 29.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 28.02.2008 | ||
GR | 29.02.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | BE | 28.11.2007 | |
CZ | 28.11.2007 | ||
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
EE | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
RO | 28.11.2007 | ||
SI | 28.11.2007 | ||
SK | 28.11.2007 | ||
IE | 29.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 28.02.2008 | ||
GR | 29.02.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | BE | 28.11.2007 | |
CZ | 28.11.2007 | ||
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
RO | 28.11.2007 | ||
SI | 28.11.2007 | ||
SK | 28.11.2007 | ||
IE | 29.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 28.02.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | BE | 28.11.2007 | |
CZ | 28.11.2007 | ||
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
RO | 28.11.2007 | ||
SI | 28.11.2007 | ||
SK | 28.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 28.02.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | BE | 28.11.2007 | |
CZ | 28.11.2007 | ||
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
RO | 28.11.2007 | ||
SI | 28.11.2007 | ||
SK | 28.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CZ | 28.11.2007 | |
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
SI | 28.11.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | FI | 28.11.2007 | |
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
SI | 28.11.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | FI | 28.11.2007 | |
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 28.02.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9938449 (COSMAN ERIC R [US]) [X] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002188194 (COSMAN ERIC R [US]) [A] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [A]US6184922 (SAITO KATSUYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-29 * the whole document * |