EP1590883 - DC/DC BRIDGE FOR CONTROLLING A DIRECT-CURRENT LOAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kone Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | [2005/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAHKONEN, Pekka Marjamäenkatu 18 FIN-05820 Hyvinkää / FI | 02 /
PUTKINEN, Esa Yli-Anttilantie 12 FIN-05830 Hyvinkää / FI | [2005/44] | Representative(s) | Graf Glück Habersack Kritzenberger Patentanwälte Wotanstrasse 64 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Zipse Habersack Kritzenberger Patentanwälte Wotanstrasse 64 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/44] | Zipse + Habersack Patentanwälte Wotanstrasse 64 D-80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04706200.5 | 29.01.2004 | [2005/44] | WO2004FI00041 | Priority number, date | FI20030000190 | 07.02.2003 Original published format: FI 20030190 | [2005/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004070933 | Date: | 19.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1590883 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1590883 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02P7/29, H02M7/5387, H02P7/00 | [2005/44] | CPC: |
H02M3/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2006/22] |
Former [2005/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DC/DC BRÜCKENSCHALTUNG FÜR STEUERUNG EINER GLEICHSTROMLAST | [2005/44] | English: | DC/DC BRIDGE FOR CONTROLLING A DIRECT-CURRENT LOAD | [2005/44] | French: | PASSERELLE CC/CC POUR COMMANDER UNE CHARGE DE COURANT CONTINU | [2005/44] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/44] | 19.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6288507 (SUZUKI YUZURU ET AL) [X] 1,2,5-10,1,2,5-10,1,2,5-10 * column 9, line 49 - line 56; figures 1-15 * * column 9, line 49 - line 56; figures 1-15 * * column 9, line 49 - line 56; figures 1-15 *; | [X]US5428522 (DABOUSSI ZAHER ET AL) [X] 1,2,5-10,1,2,5-10,1,2,5-10 * column 4, line 37 - column 10, line 9; figures 1-11 * * column 4, line 37 - column 10, line 9; figures 1-11 * * column 4, line 37 - column 10, line 9; figures 1-11 *; | [X]EP0352728 (TOSHIBA AUDIO VIDEO ENG ;TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO (JP)) [X] 1,2,5-10,1,2,5-10,1,2,5-10 * column 4, line 25 - column 11, line 56; figures 1-11 * * column 4, line 25 - column 11, line 56; figures 1-11 * * column 4, line 25 - column 11, line 56; figures 1-11 *; | [A]US6211657 (GOLUSZEK DANIEL) [A] 3,4,3,4,3,4 * column 3, line 21 - column 7, line 20; figures 1-7 * * column 3, line 21 - column 7, line 20; figures 1-7 * * column 3, line 21 - column 7, line 20; figures 1-7 * |