EP1597039 - PROCESS FOR UPGRADING WOOD PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2012 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Plato International Technology B.V. Westervoortsedijk 73 6827 AV Arnhem / NL | [2005/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOONSTRA, Michiel, Jan Dijkmanzoet 71 NL-4007 XG Tiel / NL | 02 /
KEGEL, Edo, Vincent Molenblok 28 NL-6871 TM Renkum / NL | 03 /
RIJSDIJK, Jan, Frederik Koninginnelaan 55 NL-2281 HB Rijswijk / NL | [2005/47] | Representative(s) | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/42] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2005/47] | Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 04706389.6 | 29.01.2004 | [2005/47] | WO2004NL00065 | Priority number, date | NL20031022548 | 31.01.2003 Original published format: NL 1022548 | [2005/47] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004067240 | Date: | 12.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1597039 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1597039 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B27N1/00, B27N3/00 | [2005/47] | CPC: |
C08H8/00 (EP,US);
B27N1/00 (EP,US);
B27N3/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 23.08.2005 | LV | 23.08.2005 | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VEREDELN VON HOLZTEILEN | [2005/47] | English: | PROCESS FOR UPGRADING WOOD PARTS | [2005/47] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE PIECES EN BOIS | [2005/47] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/47] | 20.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.01.2004 | AT | 18.05.2011 | BE | 18.05.2011 | CY | 18.05.2011 | CZ | 18.05.2011 | DK | 18.05.2011 | EE | 18.05.2011 | FI | 18.05.2011 | IT | 18.05.2011 | RO | 18.05.2011 | SE | 18.05.2011 | SI | 18.05.2011 | SK | 18.05.2011 | TR | 18.05.2011 | BG | 18.08.2011 | GR | 19.08.2011 | ES | 29.08.2011 | PT | 19.09.2011 | GB | 29.01.2012 | IE | 29.01.2012 | LU | 29.01.2012 | CH | 31.01.2012 | FR | 31.01.2012 | LI | 31.01.2012 | MC | 31.01.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
TR | 18.05.2011 | ||
BG | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
GB | 29.01.2012 | ||
IE | 29.01.2012 | ||
LU | 29.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
FR | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
TR | 18.05.2011 | ||
BG | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
GB | 29.01.2012 | ||
IE | 29.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
FR | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
BG | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
GB | 29.01.2012 | ||
IE | 29.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
FR | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
GB | 29.01.2012 | ||
IE | 29.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
FR | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
GB | 29.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
FR | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
GB | 29.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/46] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
GB | 29.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 18.05.2011 | |
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 18.05.2011 | |
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | PT | 19.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]SU761797 ; | [XY]EP0161766 (SHEN KUO CHENG) [X] 1-18 * page 6, lines 21-25 * * page 7, line 11 - page 8, line 11 * * claim 6 * [Y] 1-18; | [Y]CA1211913 (SHEN KUO CHENG) [Y] 1-18 * page 4, line 26 - page 5, column 3 *; | [DA]EP0373726 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [DA] * the whole document *; | [X]WO9531680 (VALTION TEKNILLINEN [FI], et al) [X] 1-11,14,18 * page 3, line 21 - page 4, line 10 * * page 6, lines 1-17 * * page 7, lines 16-23; claim - *; | [X]WO03000475 (FLETCHER BUILDING PRODUCTS LTD [NZ], et al) [X] 1-18 * claim - *; | [PA]WO03039825 (LIGNOTECH DEVELOPMENTS LTD [NZ], et al) [PA] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1981, no. 21, Database accession no. 1981-E7985D, XP002256683 & SU761797 A 19800907 (SIBE TECHN INST) [A] 1 * abstract * |