EP1599855 - AN OPTICALLY ADDRESSABLE MATRIX DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.12.2006 [2006/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/48] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRIJN, Marcellinus, P., C., M. c/o Prof . Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
BUDZELAAR, Franciscus, P., M. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
HOPPENBROUWERS, Jurgen, J., L. c/o Prof . Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
MAIANI, Maurizio c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
ROSINK, Johannes, J., W., M. c/o Prof . Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 06 /
SALTERS, Bart, A. c/o Prof . Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2005/48] | Representative(s) | Rolfes, Johannes Gerardus Albertus Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/48] | Rolfes, Johannes Gerardus Albertus Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 04706768.1 | 30.01.2004 | [2005/48] | WO2004IB50067 | Priority number, date | EP20030100320 | 13.02.2003 Original published format: EP 03100320 | [2005/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004072937 | Date: | 26.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1599855 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/02 | [2005/48] | CPC: |
G09G3/3216 (EP,US);
G09G3/02 (EP,KR,US);
G09G3/20 (EP,KR,US);
G09G3/3233 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0842 (EP,US);
G09G2300/088 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCH ADRESSIERBARE MATRIXANZEIGE | [2005/48] | English: | AN OPTICALLY ADDRESSABLE MATRIX DISPLAY | [2005/48] | French: | AFFICHEUR A MATRICE | [2005/48] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/48] | 13.11.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4808880 (THIOULOUSE PASCAL [FR]) [X] 1-5,7,9 * column 6, line 34 - line 36; figure 2 * * column 6, line 55 - line 57 * * column 6, line 64 - column 7, line 15; figure 3 * * column 7, line 26 - line 50; figure 5 *; | [AD]US6215462 (YAMADA HIROYASU [JP], et al) [AD] 6* figure 3 *; | [XP]FR2833741 (THOMSON LICENSING SA [FR]) [XP] 1-3,9 * page 1, line 5 - line 10; figures 1,2 * * page 1, line 13 * * page 2, line 13 - line 14 * * page 3, line 13 - line 31 * * page 4, line 21 - line 28 * |