EP1592053 - WIRING FABRICATING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | For all designated states SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LABORATORY CO., LTD. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAZAKI, Shunpei C/o Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. 398, Hase Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0036 / JP | 02 /
KUWABARA, Hideaki C/o Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. 398, Hase Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0036 / JP | [2005/44] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04706799.6 | 30.01.2004 | [2005/44] | WO2004JP00897 | Priority number, date | JP20030028878 | 05.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003028878 | JP20030028853 | 05.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003028853 | [2005/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004070820 | Date: | 19.08.2004 | Language: | JA | [2004/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1592053 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1592053 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.08.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/3213, H01L21/285, H01L21/28, H01L21/336, H01L21/3065, B05D3/04, H05K3/14, G09F9/30 | [2005/44] | CPC: |
H01L21/32139 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/2855 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/45589 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/509 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/54 (EP,US);
H01L21/02118 (EP);
H01L21/28562 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/312 (US);
H01L21/76802 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/76838 (EP,KR,US);
H01L27/124 (EP,KR,US);
H01L27/1288 (EP,KR,US);
H10K71/00 (EP,KR,US);
H10K71/611 (EP,KR,US);
H01J2237/3342 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, NL [2006/21] |
Former [2005/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERDRAHTUNGSHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2005/44] | English: | WIRING FABRICATING METHOD | [2005/44] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN CABLAGE | [2005/44] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2005 | Translation filed | 19.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2005 | Search fee paid | 19.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/44] | 11.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.05.2010 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 17.06.2010 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted | 15.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 24.08.2011 | NL | 24.08.2011 | [2012/09] |
Former [2012/08] | NL | 24.08.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6051150 (MIYAKAWA TAKUYA [JP]) [I] 1-6 * column 6, lines 15-25; figures 4A, 4B, 5 *; | [A]JP2002359246 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB) [A] 1-2 * figure 8 *; | [A] - C.T. GABRIEL ET AL, "INTEGRATION OF METAL MASKING AND ETCHING FOR DEEP SUBMICRON PATTERNING", J. VAC.SCI. TECHNOL. A, (20000701), vol. 18, no. 4, pages 1420 - 1424, XP002560332 [A] 1-2 * figures 2, 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.582364 | International search | [Y]JPH11340129 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [Y]JP2002151478 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD, et al); | [Y]JP2002237480 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) |