EP1600928 - LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.09.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/48] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJINE, Toshiyuki 165-51, Oshiage Sakura-shi Tochigi 329-1334 / JP | [2005/48] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/48] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 D-81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04706818.4 | 30.01.2004 | [2005/48] | WO2004JP00966 | Priority number, date | JP20030025636 | 03.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003025636 | [2005/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004070697 | Date: | 19.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1600928 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.08.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36, G09G3/20, G02F1/133 | [2005/48] | CPC: |
G09G3/3611 (EP,US);
G02F1/133 (KR);
G09G3/20 (KR);
G09G3/36 (KR);
G09G2310/061 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0247 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0252 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0261 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0613 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2006/21] |
Former [2005/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGE | [2005/48] | English: | LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY | [2005/48] | French: | AFFICHEUR A CRISTAUX LIQUIDES | [2005/48] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2005 | Translation filed | 22.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2005 | Search fee paid | 22.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 22.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/48] | 29.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 29.01.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.08.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/41] | Appeal following examination | 24.03.2010 | Appeal received No. T1503/10 | 07.06.2010 | Statement of grounds filed | 21.08.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.01.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2001055007 (MIURA SEISHI [JP], et al) [Y] 4 * abstract * * figures 1,5,6 * * paragraph [0038] *; | [A]EP1197944 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract ** paragraphs [0021] , [0048] , [0071] *; | [PXY]US2003058229 (KAWABE KAZUYOSHI [JP], et al) [PX] 1,5 * abstract * * figures 1,5 * * paragraphs [0110] , [0111] * [PY] 4 | International search | [A]JPH0766992 (FUJITSU TEN LTD); | [Y]JPH08313927 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD); | [Y]JPH09281943 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD); | [Y]JPH1097227 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2002072969 (HITACHI LTD, et al); | [A]JP2002244627 (HUABANG ELECTRONIC CO LTD); | [X]JP2002323876 (NEC CORP); | [XP]JP2003066918 (HITACHI LTD) |