EP1597739 - INSULATING ELEMENT, TOROIDAL CORE, TOROIDAL CORE CHOKE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAID TOROIDAL CORE CHOKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.06.2008 [2008/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EPCOS AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2005/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FETH, Josef Bayernweg 18 89522 Heidenheim / DE | 02 /
STABENOW, Jürgen Bühlstrasse 41 89522 Heidenheim / DE | 03 /
FEIST, Günter Jahnstrasse 23 73333 Gingen/Fils / DE | [2005/47] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/47] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04707487.7 | 03.02.2004 | [2005/47] | WO2004DE00171 | Priority number, date | DE2003108010 | 25.02.2003 Original published format: DE 10308010 | [2005/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004077459 | Date: | 10.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1597739 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1597739 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01F30/16, H01F27/32, H01F41/08, H01F41/12 | [2005/47] | CPC: |
H01F17/062 (EP,US);
H01F27/324 (EP,US);
H01F30/16 (EP,US);
H01F41/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/24] |
Former [2005/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ISOLIERTEIL, RINGKERN, RINGKERNDROSSEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER RINGKERNDROSSEL | [2005/47] | English: | INSULATING ELEMENT, TOROIDAL CORE, TOROIDAL CORE CHOKE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAID TOROIDAL CORE CHOKE | [2005/47] | French: | ELEMENT ISOLANT, NOYAU TOROIDAL, BOBINE DE CHOC A NOYAU TOROIDAL ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE BOBINE DE CHOC A NOYAU TOROIDAL | [2005/47] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/47] | 11.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3047603 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0258592 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-10* figure 3; claim 1 *; | [A]DE19932475 (VACUUMSCHMELZE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figures 2-4; claim 1 * |