EP1590832 - STORAGE CELL, STORAGE CELL ARRANGEMENT, AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A STORAGE CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG Am Campeon 1-12 85579 Neubiberg / DE | [2010/22] |
Former [2005/44] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHULER, Franz Riesengebirgsstrasse 42 D-85586 Poing / DE | [2007/19] |
Former [2005/44] | 01 /
SCHULER, Franz Ludwig-Jahn-Str. 4 01109 Dresden / DE | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/44] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04707864.7 | 04.02.2004 | [2005/44] | WO2004DE00186 | Priority number, date | DE2003104654 | 05.02.2003 Original published format: DE 10304654 | [2005/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004070841 | Date: | 19.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1590832 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1590832 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/115, H01L21/8247, H01L21/336, H01L29/788, H01L21/8246, H01L21/74 | [2005/44] | CPC: |
H01L29/66825 (EP,US);
H10B43/30 (EP,US);
H01L29/66833 (EP,US);
H01L29/7885 (EP,US);
H01L29/792 (EP,US);
H10B41/30 (EP,US);
H10B69/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2006/21] |
Former [2005/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPEICHERZELLE, SPEICHERZELLEN-ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER SPEICHERZELLE | [2005/44] | English: | STORAGE CELL, STORAGE CELL ARRANGEMENT, AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A STORAGE CELL | [2005/44] | French: | CELLULE DE MEMOIRE, SYSTEME DE CELLULES DE MEMOIRE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE CELLULE DE MEMOIRE | [2005/44] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/44] | 05.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0073370 (IBM [US]) [A] 1,18* page 8, line 24 - page 13, line 31; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US5515319 (SMAYLING MICHAEL C [US], et al) [A] 1,18 * the whole document *; | [A]US6078074 (TAKEBUCHI MASATAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1,18 * column 4, line 45 - column 5, line 45; figures 2-3b * |