EP1594696 - HEAT-SENSITIVE LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE PRECURSOR. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa Graphics N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [2007/09] |
Former [2005/46] | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Damme, Marc, c/o Agfa-Gevaert Corporate IP Dept. 3800, Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | 02 /
Hendrikx, Peter, c/o Agfa-Gevaert Corporate IP Dept. 3800, Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [2005/46] | Representative(s) | Goedeweeck, Rudi, et al AGFA NV Intellectual Property Department Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/09] | Goedeweeck, Rudi, et al Agfa Graphics N.V. IP Department 3622 Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | Application number, filing date | 04707943.9 | 04.02.2004 | [2005/46] | WO2004EP50080 | Priority number, date | EP20030100280 | 11.02.2003 Original published format: EP 03100280 | US20030450612P | 27.02.2003 Original published format: US 450612 P | [2005/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004071767 | Date: | 26.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1594696 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1594696 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B41C1/10 | [2005/46] | CPC: |
B41C1/1008 (EP,US);
B41C1/10 (KR);
B41C1/1016 (EP,US);
B41C2201/02 (EP,US);
B41C2201/14 (EP,US);
B41C2210/04 (EP,US);
B41C2210/06 (EP,US);
B41C2210/22 (EP,US);
B41C2210/24 (EP,US);
B41C2210/262 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2006/22] |
Former [2005/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMEEMPFINDLICHER LITHOGRAPHISCHER DRUCKPLATTENVORLÄUFER | [2005/46] | English: | HEAT-SENSITIVE LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE PRECURSOR. | [2005/46] | French: | PRECURSEUR DE PLAQUE D'IMPRESSION LITHOGRAPHIQUE THERMOSENSIBLE | [2005/46] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/46] | 09.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 15.08.2007 | IT | 29.02.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2008/21] | BE | 15.08.2007 | Cited in | International search | [XD]EP1188797 (YAMAMOTO CHEMICALS INC [JP]) [XD] 1-12 * figure 10; claims 1,10,11 * * page 3, line 41 - page 4, line 21 * * page 28, line 16 - line 22 * * page 28, line 41 - line 47 * * example 19; table 1 *; | [AD]EP1096315 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [AD] 1-12 * examples 1-12; claims 1,6,13-20 * * page 6, line 1 - line 10 * * page 18, line 1 - page 19, line 48 *; | [AD]EP1129845 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [AD] 1-12 * example 14; claims 1,2,11 * * page 3, line 1 - line 41 * * page 6, line 7 - page 7, line 21 * * page 10, line 41 - page 11, line 21 * * page 16, line 25 - line 51 * * page 21, line 16 - page 23, line 1 * | by applicant | EP2102443 | EP2102444 | EP2102445 | EP2102446 | EP0823327 | US5174205 | US5163368 | EP0556690 |