EP1594126 - POLYESTER FILM FOR RECORDING MEDIUM AND MAGNETIC RECORDING TAPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 2-1, Nihonbashi Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [2008/33] |
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 2-1, Nihonbashi Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ONO, Masaaki Toray Showa-ryo 122 1419, Godo, Godo-cho Anpachi-gun, Gifu 5032305 / JP | 02 /
FUKATA, Kazuyoshi 1145-2, Minamigasa-cho Kusatsu-shi, Shiga 5250056 / JP | 03 /
YAGI, Masahiro Toray Daisen-ryo 1-1, Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 5208558 / JP | [2008/33] |
Former [2005/45] | 01 /
Ono, Masaaki Toray Showa-ryo 122 1419, Godo, Godo-cho Anpachi-gun, Gifu 5032305 / JP | ||
02 /
Fukata, Kazuyoshi 1145-2, Minamigasa-cho Kusatsu-shi, Shiga 5250056 / JP | |||
03 /
Yagi, Masahiro Toray Daisen-ryo 1-1, Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 5208558 / JP | Representative(s) | Webster, Jeremy Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | Webster, Jeremy Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [2005/45] | Coleiro, Raymond, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 04708015.5 | 04.02.2004 | [2005/45] | WO2004JP01097 | Priority number, date | JP20030030625 | 07.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003030625 | [2005/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004070713 | Date: | 19.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1594126 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1594126 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.08.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/733, C08J7/04, B32B27/20, B32B27/36 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
B32B27/36 (EP,KR,US);
G11B5/62 (KR);
B32B15/09 (US);
C08J5/18 (KR);
C08J7/0427 (EP,US);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C08J7/046 (EP,US);
G11B5/712 (KR);
G11B5/73927 (EP,US);
G11B5/73929 (EP,US);
G11B5/73931 (EP,US);
B32B2307/208 (US);
B32B2367/00 (US);
B32B2429/02 (US);
C08J2367/02 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24405 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/45] | G11B5/73 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/22] |
Former [2005/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYESTERFILM FÜR EIN AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM UND MAGNETAUFZEICHNUNGSBAND | [2005/45] | English: | POLYESTER FILM FOR RECORDING MEDIUM AND MAGNETIC RECORDING TAPE | [2005/45] | French: | FILM POLYESTER DESTINE A UN SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT ET BANDE D'ENREGISTREMENT MAGNETIQUE | [2005/45] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2005 | Translation filed | 29.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2005 | Search fee paid | 29.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/45] | 10.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1047048 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-12* page 2, line 5 - line 9; claims 1,5,6,15 *; | [XY]JP2002363310 (TEIJIN DUPONT FILMS JAPAN LTD) [X] 13-18 * paragraphs [0046] , [0060] , [0107] , [0123] , [0124]; claims 1,4-7 * [Y] 1-12; | [Y]JP2003025526 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0059] * * page 9; tables 1,2 * * claims 1,2,6,7 *; | [PX]JP2003346326 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [PX] 7,10-12 * paragraphs [0017] , [0023]; claims 1,4-6 * | International search | [X]JP2000025105 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) |