EP1592720 - SILANE MOISTURE CURED HEAT RESISTANT FIBERS MADE FROM POLYOLEFIN ELASTOMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 28.05.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2010 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 30.06.2010 [2010/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC. Washington Street - 1790 Building Midland MI 48674 / US | [2010/26] |
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC. Washington Street, 1790 Building Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALIA, Parvinder, S. 5220 Hedgewood Drive, Apt. 1014 Midland, MI 48640 / US | 02 /
PATEL, Rajen, M. 114 Scarlet Oak Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US | 03 /
KLIER, John 5215 Shoal Creek Circle Midland, MI 48642 / US | 04 /
WEAVER, John, D. 122 Anchusa Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US | 05 /
LADIKA, Mladen 4714 Blossom Circle Midland, MI 48642 / US | 06 /
ESSEGHIR, Mohamed 5 Robin Lane Monroe Township, NJ 08831 / US | 07 /
COGEN, Jeffrey, N. 6 Braintree Court Flemington, NJ 08822 / US | [2005/45] | Representative(s) | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd, et al Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 04708225.0 | 04.02.2004 | [2005/45] | WO2004US03241 | Priority number, date | US20030445116P | 05.02.2003 Original published format: US 445116 P | [2005/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004072135 | Date: | 26.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1592720 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1592720 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1592720 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08F255/02, C08F8/42 | [2005/45] | CPC: |
D01F6/30 (EP,US);
C08F255/00 (EP,US);
C08F255/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08F8/42 (EP,KR,US);
C08L51/06 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F255/02, C08F230/085 (US,KR,EP);
C08F8/42, C08F10/00 (EP,US);
C08L51/06, C08L2666/02 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SILAN-FEUCHTIGKEITSGEHÄRTETE WÄRMEBESTÄNDIGE FASERN AUS POLYOLEFIN-ELASTOMEREN | [2005/45] | English: | SILANE MOISTURE CURED HEAT RESISTANT FIBERS MADE FROM POLYOLEFIN ELASTOMERS | [2005/45] | French: | FIBRES RESISTANTES A LA CHALEUR, DURCIES A L'HUMIDITE, A BASE DE SILANE, CONSTITUEES D'ELASTOMERES POLYOLEFINIQUES | [2005/45] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/45] | 14.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.08.2007
24.08.2007
ADMISSIBLE Leibniz-Institut für Polymerforschung Dresden e.V. Hohe Strasse 6 01069 Dresden / DE Opponent's representative Rauschenbach, Marion, et al, et al Rauschenbach Patentanwälte Postfach 27 01 75 01172 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.08.2007
24.08.2007
ADMISSIBLE Leibniz-Institut für Polymerforschung Dresden e.V. Hohe Strasse 6 01069 Dresden / DE Opponent's representative Rauschenbach, Marion, et al, et al Rauschenbach Patentanwälte Postfach 27 01 75 01172 Dresden / DE | 27.09.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.05.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 30.09.2009 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 30.09.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.10.2009 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 13.10.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 03.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 13.05.2010 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.11.2006 | CH | 22.11.2006 | CY | 22.11.2006 | CZ | 22.11.2006 | EE | 22.11.2006 | FI | 22.11.2006 | LI | 22.11.2006 | NL | 22.11.2006 | RO | 22.11.2006 | SI | 22.11.2006 | SK | 22.11.2006 | TR | 22.11.2006 | LU | 04.02.2007 | IE | 05.02.2007 | BG | 22.02.2007 | DK | 22.02.2007 | GR | 23.02.2007 | MC | 28.02.2007 | ES | 05.03.2007 | PT | 23.04.2007 | HU | 23.05.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/41] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
CY | 22.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2006 | ||
EE | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
RO | 22.11.2006 | ||
SI | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
LU | 04.02.2007 | ||
IE | 05.02.2007 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
HU | 23.05.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2006 | ||
EE | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
RO | 22.11.2006 | ||
SI | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
IE | 05.02.2007 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
RO | 22.11.2006 | ||
SI | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
IE | 05.02.2007 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
RO | 22.11.2006 | ||
SI | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
IE | 05.02.2007 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
RO | 22.11.2006 | ||
SI | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
RO | 22.11.2006 | ||
SI | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
RO | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/29] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4529750 (GIMPEL FRANCO [IT]) [A] 1-38 * example 1 *; | [X]EP0300718 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [X] 1,4,5,7-27,29-38 * example 1; claim - *; | [A]US5741858 (BRANN JEFFERY E [US], et al) [A] 1-38* column 8, line 56 - column 9, line 17; claim - * | Opposition | - M. HOFFMANN ET AL., "Schmelzspinnen mit dem Doppelschneckenextruder", KAUTSCHUK GUMMI-KUNSTSTOFFE, (2000), vol. 53, no. 11, pages 632 - 637 |