EP1592448 - USE OF A PORPHYRIN COMPOUND FOR THE TREATMENT OF SKIN FUNGI [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stichting voor de Technische Wetenschappen Van Vollenhovenlaan 661 3527 JP Utrecht / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Stichting voor de Technische Wetenschappen Van Vollenhovenlaan 661 3527 JP Utrecht / NL | ||
Former [2008/42] | For all designated states Stichting voor de Technische Wetenschappen Van Vollenhovenlaan 661 3527 JP Wageningen / NL | ||
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states Photobiochem N.V. Wassenaarseweg 72 2333 AL Leiden / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMIJS, Geertruida, Maria, Theresia Ericaduin 3 NL-2318 XP Leiden / NL | 02 /
SCHUITMAKER, Johannes, Joseph Stokroos 50 NL-2317 ER Leiden / NL | [2005/45] | Representative(s) | van Breda, Jacobus, et al Octrooibureau Los & Stigter B.V. P.O. Box 20052 1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/11] | Van Breda, Jacobus, et al Octrooibureau Los & Stigter B.V., Weteringschans 96 1017 XS Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2005/45] | Kupecz, Arpad, et al Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. Postbox 20052 1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 04708525.3 | 05.02.2004 | [2005/45] | WO2004NL00079 | Priority number, date | NL20031022597 | 05.02.2003 Original published format: NL 1022597 | [2005/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004069273 | Date: | 19.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1592448 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61P31/10, A61K31/409, A61K31/4425 | [2012/11] | CPC: |
A61K41/0071 (EP,US);
A61P31/02 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/45] | A61K41/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINER PORPHYRIN-VERBINDUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HAUTPILZEN | [2005/45] | English: | USE OF A PORPHYRIN COMPOUND FOR THE TREATMENT OF SKIN FUNGI | [2005/45] | French: | UTILISATION D'UN COMPOSE DE PORPHYRINE POUR TRAITER DES MYCOSES | [2012/11] |
Former [2005/45] | UTILISATION D'UN COMPOSE DE PORPHYRINE POUR TRAITER DES CHAMPIGNONS CUTANES | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.08.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/45] | 22.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/03] | 24.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.12.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]FR2723694 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 9-11 * page 2 - page 3; claim 1 * * page 4, line 35 - page 5, line 8 * * page 7 - page 8 * [Y] 1-7; | [XY]WO9833503 (UNIV TEXAS [US], et al) [X] 9-11 * claims 13-15,18,19; tables 3,7 * * see compound B6 * [Y] 1-7; | [X]WO9839011 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,9,11 * page 5, lines 17-19 * * page 20 * * page 42, lines 20-27; claims 19,20,28,38,47,53 *; | [XY]WO9923097 (UNIV DUKE [US]) [X] 9,11 * page 13, lines 14,15; figure 2; example 1; claims 1-4,16,19 * [Y] 1-3,6,7; | [Y]EP1197229 (BOSTON CLINICS PDT B V [NL]) [Y] 1-7,9-11 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [PX]WO03011265 (PHOTOCURE ASA [NO], et al) [PX] 9-11 * page 8, line 10 - page 9, line 6; claim 1 * * page 11, lines 35,36 *; | [PX]WO03086389 (PHOTOBIOCHEM LEIDEN NV [NL], et al) [PX] 9-11 * abstract *; | [X] - SHI, DONG-FANG ET AL, "Quadruplex-Interactive Agents as Telomerase Inhibitors: Synthesis of Porphyrins and Structure-Activity Relationship for the Inhibition of Telomerase", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY (2001), 44(26), 4509-4523, (2001), XP001149457 [X] 9-11 * table 4; compound 52 * * see conclusions * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm010246u | [PX] - SMIJS THREES G M ET AL, "Photodynamic inactivation of the dermatophyte Trichophyton rubrum.", PHOTOCHEMISTRY AND PHOTOBIOLOGY. UNITED STATES MAY 2003, (200305), vol. 77, no. 5, ISSN 0031-8655, pages 556 - 560, XP008030728 [PX] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1562/0031-8655(2003)077<0556:PIOTDT>2.0.CO;2 | [XP] - OUF S. A. ET AL, "Study of solar photosensitization processes on dermatophytic fungi", ACTA MICROBIOLOGICA POLONICA, (2003), vol. 52, pages 65 - 79, XP008030746 [XP] 1-7,11 * abstract * | [I] - KALKA K ET AL, "PHOTODYNAMIC THERAPY IN DERMATOLOGY", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF DERMATOLOGY, C.V. MOSBY, ST. LOUIS, MO, US, (200003), vol. 42, no. 3, ISSN 0190-9622, pages 389 - 413, XP000982056 [I] 1-7,9-11 * abstract * * page 391 * * page 400, column 2, paragraph 3 * * page 402, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0190-9622(00)90209-3 | [Y] - OBERSTE-LEHN H ET AL, "EFFICACY OF 8 METHOXY PSORALEN AND BLACK LIGHT AGAINST MICROORGANISMS IN-VITRO AND IN ANIMAL EXPERIMENTS", DERMATOLOGICA (BASEL), (1977), vol. 154, no. 4, ISSN 0011-9075, pages 193 - 202, XP008030748 [Y] 1-7,9-11 * abstract * | [Y] - ROMAGNOLI C ET AL, "The photodynamic effect of 5-(4-hydroxyl-1-butinyl)-2,2'-bithienyl on dermatophytes", MYCOLOGICAL RESEARCH, (199812), vol. 102, no. 12, ISSN 0953-7562, pages 1519 - 1524, XP008030738 [Y] 1-7,9-11 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1017/S0953756298006637 | [XY] - KVELLO STENSTROM A. G. ET AL, "Phtodynamic inactivation of yeast cells sensitized by hematoporphyrin", PHOTOCHEMISTRY AND PHOTOBIOLOGY, (1980), vol. 32, pages 349 - 352, XP008030792 [X] 11 * abstract * [Y] 1-7,9,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1751-1097.1980.tb03773.x | [XY] - NITZAN Y. ET AL, "Inactivation of anaerobic bacteria by various photosensitized porphyrins or by hemin", CURRENT MICROBIOLOGY, (1994), vol. 29, pages 125 - 131, XP008030737 [X] 11 * abstract * [Y] 1-7,9,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01570752 | Examination | WO9605862 |