EP1606861 - A SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR AN IMPROVED LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2018/17] |
Former [2005/51] | For all designated states INTEL CORPORATION 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARDNER, Donald 2281 Oaktree Drive Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | [2005/51] | Representative(s) | Rummler, Felix, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/17] | Rummler, Felix, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2005/51] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al R G C Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04708650.9 | 05.02.2004 | [2005/51] | WO2004US03597 | Priority number, date | US20030393643 | 21.03.2003 Original published format: US 393643 | [2005/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004095592 | Date: | 04.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1606861 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1606861 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/08, H01S3/16 | [2005/51] | CPC: |
B82Y20/00 (EP,US);
H01S3/16 (EP,US);
H01S3/0632 (EP,US);
H01S3/08009 (EP,US);
H01S3/09 (EP,US);
H01S3/091 (EP,US);
H01S3/0933 (EP,US);
H01S3/09403 (EP,US);
H01S3/1603 (EP,US);
H01S3/1608 (EP,US);
H01S3/1628 (EP,US);
H01S3/1655 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/17] |
Former [2005/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR EINE VERBESSERTE LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG | [2005/51] | English: | A SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR AN IMPROVED LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE | [2005/51] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE CONCERNANT UN DISPOSITIF ELECTROLUMINESCENT AMELIORE | [2005/51] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/51] | 24.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.03.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 16.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 13.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.02.2004 | AT | 25.04.2018 | CY | 25.04.2018 | CZ | 25.04.2018 | DK | 25.04.2018 | EE | 25.04.2018 | ES | 25.04.2018 | FI | 25.04.2018 | IT | 25.04.2018 | MC | 25.04.2018 | NL | 25.04.2018 | RO | 25.04.2018 | SE | 25.04.2018 | SI | 25.04.2018 | SK | 25.04.2018 | TR | 25.04.2018 | BG | 25.07.2018 | GR | 26.07.2018 | PT | 27.08.2018 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CY | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 25.04.2018 | |
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 25.04.2018 | |
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 25.04.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XY]JP2001203382 ; | [A]US3868589 (WANG SHYH) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [A]EP0511779 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 33-45 * the whole document *; | [XY] - KIK P G ET AL, "Gain limiting processes in Er-doped Si nanocrystal waveguides in DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1418417 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010511), vol. 2000, no. 24, & JP2001203382 A 20010727 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1,25 * abstract * [Y] 33,42 | [XA] - POLMAN A, "Miniature erbium doped planar optical amplifiers", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 27TH CONFERENCE ON OPTICAL COMMUNICATION 2001, AMSTERDAM, (20010930), vol. 4, pages 632 - 633, XP010582715 [X] 1,25 * page 632, column L, paragraph 1; figure 1 * [A] 6,20,22 | [A] - KIK P G ET AL, "Exciton-erbium energy transfer in Si nanocrystal-doped SiO2", MATERIALS SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING B, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA, LAUSANNE, CH, (20010424), vol. 81, no. 1-3, ISSN 0921-5107, pages 3 - 8, XP004234597 [A] 1-45 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0921-5107(00)00667-X | [A] - FRANZÒ GIORGIA ET AL, " DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.126286 | [A] - O'BRIEN S ET AL, "HIGH-POWER GAINAS LASERS WITH DISTRIBUTED BRAGG REFLECTORS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION CONFERENCE. SAN JOSE, FEB. 2 - 7, 1992, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19920202), vol. CONF. 15, ISBN 1-55752-222-7, page 42, XP000341541 [A] 1-5 * figure 1 * | by applicant | JP2001203382 | - KIK P G ET AL., "Gain limiting processes in Er-doped Si nanocrystal waveguides in Si02", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, (20020101), vol. 91, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1063/1.1418417, pages 534 - 536, XP012054538 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1418417 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010511), vol. 2000, no. 24 | - POLMAN A, "Miniature erbium doped planar optical amplifiers", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 27TH CONFERENCE ON OPTICAL COMMUNICATION, (20010930), vol. 4, pages 632 - 633, XP010582715 |