EP1603411 - METHOD FOR REDUCING ACRYLAMIDE FORMATION IN THERMALLY PROCESSED FOODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Frito-Lay North America, Inc., formerly known as Recot, Inc. 7701 Legacy Drive Plano, TX 75266 / US | [2005/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELDER, Vincent, Allen 2903 Panorama Drive Carrollton, TX 75007 / US | 02 /
FULCHER, John, Gregory 9930 Ontario Lane Dallas, TX 75220 / US | 03 /
LEUNG, Henry, Kin-Hang 3704 Ellington Drive Plano, TX 75093 / US | 04 /
TOPOR, Michael, Grant 3573 Pennacle Bay Point Little Elm, TX 75068 / US | [2005/50] | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | Jenkins, Peter David, et al PAGE WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 04709042.8 | 06.02.2004 | [2005/50] | WO2004US03448 | Priority number, date | US20030372154 | 21.02.2003 Original published format: US 372154 | [2005/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004075657 | Date: | 10.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1603411 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1603411 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.11.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/29, A23L1/304, A23L1/305, A23L1/015, A23L1/217, A23L3/358, A21D2/02, A21D2/06, A21D8/02 | [2006/49] | CPC: |
A21D2/02 (EP,KR,US);
A23L33/00 (KR);
A23L19/18 (EP,US);
A23L19/19 (EP,US);
A23L5/27 (EP,US);
A23L5/276 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/14] | A23L1/164, A23L1/015, A23L1/217 | ||
Former IPC [2005/50] | A23L1/29, A23L1/304, A23L1/305, A23L1/015, A23L1/217, A23L3/358, A21D2/02, A21D2/06, A21D8/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REDUZIERUNG VON ACRYLAMIDBILDUNG IN THERMISCH VERARBEITETEN LEBENSMITTELN | [2005/50] | English: | METHOD FOR REDUCING ACRYLAMIDE FORMATION IN THERMALLY PROCESSED FOODS | [2005/50] | French: | PROCEDE DE REDUCTION DE LA FORMATION D'ACRYLAMIDE DANS DES ALIMENTS SOUMIS A LA TRANSFORMATION THERMIQUE | [2005/50] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2005 | Search fee paid | 19.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.09.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 08.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07075309.0 / EP1810578 | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.01.2008 | CH | 09.01.2008 | CY | 09.01.2008 | CZ | 09.01.2008 | DK | 09.01.2008 | EE | 09.01.2008 | FI | 09.01.2008 | IT | 09.01.2008 | LI | 09.01.2008 | RO | 09.01.2008 | SI | 09.01.2008 | SK | 09.01.2008 | LU | 06.02.2008 | MC | 28.02.2008 | BG | 09.04.2008 | [2010/33] |
Former [2009/41] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
CY | 09.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
EE | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
IT | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
RO | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
CY | 09.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
EE | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
RO | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
EE | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
RO | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
RO | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CH | 09.01.2008 | |
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | SI | 09.01.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2448152 (PATTON ALVA R) [X] 17 * column 2, lines 22-31; claims 5-7 *; | [X]US4272554 (SCHROEDER OTTO E, et al) [X] 17 * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 52; claim - * * column 2, lines 18-32 *; | [X]US5620727 (GERRISH TIMOTHY C [US], et al) [X] 17 * column 2, lines 23-25; examples 1,4,13,17,29,31,32; claims 1,9 *; | [T]EP1419703 (VICO S A [FR], et al) [T] 1-9,11,15-19* paragraph [0032]; claims 18,19,28 *; | [T]US2004126469 (TOMODA YOSHIO [JP], et al) [T] 1-19 * the whole document * | International search | [X]GB335214 (JOSEF DAPPER); | [X]US5514387 (ZIMMERMAN ELLEN L [US], et al); | [X]US6210720 (LEUSNER STEVEN J [US], et al); | [X]US2002015759 (PROSISE ROBERT LAWRENCE [US], et al) |