EP1599922 - CONTACT PLUG WITH MEANS FOR FACILITATING DISENGAGEMENT FROM A SOCKET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2010 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Christensen, Tom Nemovej 9 DK-2680, Solroed Strand / DK | [2005/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/48] | Representative(s) | Jakobsen, Gert Ho̸y Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2005/48] | Jakobsen, Gert Hoey Albihns A/S, H.C. Andersens Boulevard 49 1553 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 04709583.1 | 10.02.2004 | [2005/48] | WO2004DK00093 | Priority number, date | DK20030000246 | 18.02.2003 Original published format: DK 200300246 | DK20040000106 | 27.01.2004 Original published format: DK 200400106 | [2005/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004075360 | Date: | 02.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1599922 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 02.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/633, H01R13/62 | [2005/48] | CPC: |
H01R13/6335 (EP);
H01R2103/00 (EP);
H01R24/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONTAKTSTECKER MIT MITTELN ZUR LOSLÖSUNG VON EINER STECKDOSE | [2005/48] | English: | CONTACT PLUG WITH MEANS FOR FACILITATING DISENGAGEMENT FROM A SOCKET | [2005/48] | French: | FICHE DE CONTACT | [2005/48] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 01.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/08] | 07.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB2361589 ; | [Y]US6095849 ; | [A]DE29807627U ; | [A]FR2740618 |