EP1592780 - DYRKS AS MODIFIERS OF THE APC AND AXIN PATHWAYS AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.05.2009 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Exelixis, Inc. 170 Harbor Way, P.O. Box 511 South San Francisco, CA 94083-0511 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states Exelixis, Inc. 170 Harbor Way, P.O. Box 511 South San Francisco, CA 94083-0511 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GENDREAU, Steven, Brian 2801 Turk Street 103 San Francisco, CA 94118 / US | 02 /
MORABLANCO, Eva, Lorena 145 Manor Drive San Francisco, CA 94127 / US | 03 /
HEUER, Timothy, S. 315 Avenue Del Oro, PO Box 506 El Granada, California 94018 / US | 04 /
LICKTEIG, Kim 1334 Division Highland Park, Illinois 60035 / US | [2007/09] |
Former [2005/45] | 01 /
GENDREAU, Steven, Brian 2801 Turk Street 103 San Francisco, CA 94118 / US | ||
02 /
MORABLANCO, Eva, Lorena 145 Manor Drive San Francisco, CA 94127 / US | |||
03 /
HEUER, Timothy, S. 581A Paloma Avenue Pacifica, CA 94044 / US | |||
04 /
LICKTEIG, Kim 1921 Grove Street San Francisco, CA 94117 / US | Representative(s) | Main, Malcolm Charles, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Main, Malcolm Charles, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 04709871.0 | 10.02.2004 | [2005/45] | WO2004US03803 | Priority number, date | US20030447358P | 11.02.2003 Original published format: US 447358 P | [2005/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004072257 | Date: | 26.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1592780 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.01.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/47, A61K38/00, G01N33/542 | [2008/14] | CPC: |
C12Q1/485 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
G01N33/57407 (EP,US);
G01N33/57496 (EP,US);
G01N2500/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/45] | C12N1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/45] | Extension states | AL | 19.07.2005 | LT | 19.07.2005 | LV | 19.07.2005 | MK | 19.07.2005 | Title | German: | DYRKS ALS MODIFIKATOREN DES APC- UND DES AXIN-WEGS SOWIE VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN | [2005/45] | English: | DYRKS AS MODIFIERS OF THE APC AND AXIN PATHWAYS AND METHODS OF USE | [2005/45] | French: | DYRKS UTILISES COMME MODIFICATEURS DES VOIES D'APC ET D'AXIN ET LEURS PROCEDES D'UTILISATION | [2005/45] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2005 | Search fee paid | 19.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/45] | 24.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/26] | 10.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO02090544 (HYBRIGENICS SA [FR], et al) [Y] 1-25 * page 22, line 1; table 2 ** paragraphs [0017] - [0021] - [0031] , [0141] - [0148] - [0203] , [0209] *; | [Y] - YOUNG B A ET AL, "The counteradhesive protein SPARC regulates an endothelial paracellular pathway through protein tyrosine phosphorylation.", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS 9 OCT 1998, (19981009), vol. 251, no. 1, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 320 - 327, XP002496566 [Y] 1-25 * page 324, column R, paragraph 1; figure 7 * * page 325, column R, paragraph 3 - page 326, column R, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1998.9475 | International search | [YP]US2003232421 (LEGRAIN PIERRE [FR], et al); | [Y]US2003211606 (DOBIE KENNETH W [US], et al) |