EP1595152 - ARC FAULT DETECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 09.06.2010 [2010/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Avenue P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07960 / US | ||
Former [2005/46] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07960 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CSANKY, Peter, H. 4 Ravensdale Road Cobourg, Ontario K9A 2B9 / CA | 02 /
BORDIGNON, Ivo, M. 56 Sterne Street Bolton, Ontario L7E 1B9 / CA | 03 /
FERINO, Robert, M. 54 Ronald Avenue Toronto, Ontario M6E 4M7 / CA | [2005/46] | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/51] | Haley, Stephen, et al Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2005/46] | Hucker, Charlotte Jane, et al Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 04709877.7 | 10.02.2004 | [2005/46] | WO2004US03928 | Priority number, date | US20030365317 | 12.02.2003 Original published format: US 365317 | [2005/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004072814 | Date: | 26.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1595152 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1595152 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/02, H02H1/00, G01R31/12 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
H02H1/0015 (EP,US);
G01R31/1272 (EP,US);
G01R31/59 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/46] | G01R31/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2006/22] |
Former [2005/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LICHTBOGENFEHLERDETEKTIONSSYSTEM | [2008/17] | English: | ARC FAULT DETECTION SYSTEM | [2005/46] | French: | SYSTEME DE DETECTION DE DEFAUTS D'ARC | [2005/46] |
Former [2005/46] | BOGENFEHLERDETEKTIONSSYSTEM | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/46] | 22.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 17.09.2008 | ES | 28.12.2008 | GB | 10.02.2009 | [2010/23] |
Former [2009/41] | IT | 17.09.2008 | |
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 28.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5434509 (BLADES FREDERICK K [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]US5477150 (HAM JR HOWARD M [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]US6128169 (NEIGER BENJAMIN B [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]DE19930685 (LOHER AG [DE]) [A] 1-10* abstract * |