EP1605767 - PROCESS FOR IMPROVEMENT OF MEAT QUALITY IN FISH, PROTEIN HYDROLYSATE AND METHOD OF PRODUCING A PROTEIN HYDROLYSATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marine Bioproducts AS 5393 Storebø / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2005/51] | For all designated states Marine Bioproducts AS 5393 Storeboe / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAGEN, Harald N-5392 Storebø / NO | 02 /
SANDNES, Kjartan Bønesskogen 284 N-5152 Bønes / NO | [2011/37] |
Former [2011/21] | 01 /
HAGEN, Harald N-5392 Storebo / NO | ||
02 /
SANDNES, Kjartan Bonesskogen 284 N-5152 Bones / NO | |||
Former [2005/51] | 01 /
HAGEN, Harald N-5392 Storebo / NO | ||
02 /
SANDNES, Kjartan B nesskogen 284 N-5152 Bones / NO | Representative(s) | Acapo AS Edvard Griegs vei 1 5059 Bergen / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2011/39] | Acapo AS P.O. Box 1880 Nordnes 5817 Bergen / NO | ||
Former [2011/07] | Acapo AS P.O. Box 1880 Nordnes 5817 Bergen / NO | ||
Former [2005/51] | Stenbäck, Maria Elisabeth Awapatent AB P.O. Box 5117 S-200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 04710567.1 | 12.02.2004 | [2005/51] | WO2004NO00043 | Priority number, date | NO20030000684 | 12.02.2003 Original published format: NO 20030684 | [2005/51] | Filing language | NO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004071202 | Date: | 26.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1605767 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1605767 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 26.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A23B4/20, A23J1/04 | [2005/51] | CPC: |
A23B4/20 (EP);
A23J1/04 (EP);
A23J1/10 (EP);
A23J3/341 (EP);
A23L17/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER FLEISCHQUALITÄT VON FISCH,PROTEINHYDROLYSAT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES PROTEINHYDROLYSATS | [2005/51] | English: | PROCESS FOR IMPROVEMENT OF MEAT QUALITY IN FISH, PROTEIN HYDROLYSATE AND METHOD OF PRODUCING A PROTEIN HYDROLYSATE | [2005/51] | French: | PROCEDE D'AMELIORATION DE LA QUALITE DE LA CHAIR DE POISSON, HYDROLYSAT DE PROTEINES ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN HYDROLYSAT DE PROTEINES | [2005/51] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/51] | 20.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.09.2006 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.02.2004 | AT | 28.09.2011 | BE | 28.09.2011 | CY | 28.09.2011 | CZ | 28.09.2011 | EE | 28.09.2011 | FI | 28.09.2011 | GR | 28.09.2011 | IT | 28.09.2011 | NL | 28.09.2011 | RO | 28.09.2011 | SE | 28.09.2011 | SI | 28.09.2011 | SK | 28.09.2011 | TR | 28.09.2011 | BG | 28.12.2011 | ES | 08.01.2012 | PT | 30.01.2012 | IE | 12.02.2012 | LU | 12.02.2012 | CH | 29.02.2012 | FR | 29.02.2012 | LI | 29.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | [2014/38] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 12.02.2004 | |
AT | 28.09.2011 | ||
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
TR | 28.09.2011 | ||
BG | 28.12.2011 | ||
ES | 08.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
IE | 12.02.2012 | ||
LU | 12.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
TR | 28.09.2011 | ||
BG | 28.12.2011 | ||
ES | 08.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
IE | 12.02.2012 | ||
LU | 12.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
TR | 28.09.2011 | ||
BG | 28.12.2011 | ||
ES | 08.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
IE | 12.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
BG | 28.12.2011 | ||
ES | 08.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
IE | 12.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
ES | 08.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
IE | 12.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
IE | 12.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 28.09.2011 | |
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 28.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS6236165 ; | [X]JPH02113859 ; | [A]US3989851 (HAWLEY ROBERT LYLE, et al); | [A]EP0031631 (KROGER CO [US]); | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, & JP62036165 A 19870217 (AMOU SUISAN KK) | [X] - KIM S.-K., ET AL., "Isolation and Characterization of Antioxidative Peptides from Gelatin Hydrolysate of Alaska Pollack Skin", J. AGRIC. FOOD CHEM., (2001), vol. 49, pages 1984 - 1989, XP002979282 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf000494j | [XP] - JUN S.-Y., ET AL., "Purification and characterization of an antioxidative peptide from enzymatic hydrolysate of yellowfin sole (Limanda aspera) frame protein", EUR. FOOD RES. TECHNOL., (2004), vol. 219, pages 20 - 26, XP002979283 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00217-004-0882-9 | [X] - SHAHIDI F., ET AL., "Production and characteristics of protein hydrolysates from capelin (Mallotus villosus)", FOOD CHEMISTRY, (1995), vol. 53, pages 285 - 293, XP002979284 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0308-8146(95)93934-J | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, & JP02113859 A 19900426 (NITTO DENKO CORP ET AL.) |