EP1639310 - BARRICADE BREAKER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RUAG Ammotec Uttigenstrasse 67 3602 Thun / CH | [2006/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MICHEL, Martin; Weekendweg 1A CH-3646 Einigen; / CH | 02 /
ANDEREGG, Peter Brunnenstrasse 9 CH-3123 Belp / CH | 03 /
BISSIG, Josef Tschudiweg 8 CH-6460 Altdorf / CH | [2006/13] | Representative(s) | Frauenknecht, Alois J. PPS Polyvalent Patent Service AG Waldrütistrasse 21 8954 Geroldswil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/13] | Frauenknecht, Alois J. c/o PPS Polyvalent Patent Service AG, Waldrütistrasse 21 8954 Geroldswil / CH | Application number, filing date | 04710769.3 | 13.02.2004 | [2006/13] | WO2004CH00084 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005078379 | Date: | 25.08.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1639310 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1639310 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F42B12/08, F42B12/46, F42B14/06 | [2006/13] | CPC: |
F42B12/46 (EP);
F42B12/08 (EP);
F42B14/061 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BARIKADENBRECHER | [2006/13] | English: | BARRICADE BREAKER | [2006/13] | French: | PERCE BARRICADE | [2006/13] | Entry into regional phase | 24.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 24.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.12.2004 | Examination requested [2006/13] | 31.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 08.11.2006 | CZ | 08.11.2006 | EE | 08.11.2006 | RO | 08.11.2006 | SI | 08.11.2006 | SK | 08.11.2006 | TR | 08.11.2006 | BG | 08.02.2007 | LU | 13.02.2007 | MC | 28.02.2007 | HU | 09.05.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/41] | CY | 08.11.2006 | |
CZ | 08.11.2006 | ||
EE | 08.11.2006 | ||
RO | 08.11.2006 | ||
SI | 08.11.2006 | ||
SK | 08.11.2006 | ||
BG | 08.02.2007 | ||
LU | 13.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
HU | 09.05.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | CZ | 08.11.2006 | |
EE | 08.11.2006 | ||
RO | 08.11.2006 | ||
SI | 08.11.2006 | ||
SK | 08.11.2006 | ||
BG | 08.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | CZ | 08.11.2006 | |
RO | 08.11.2006 | ||
SI | 08.11.2006 | ||
SK | 08.11.2006 | ||
BG | 08.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | CZ | 08.11.2006 | |
RO | 08.11.2006 | ||
SI | 08.11.2006 | ||
SK | 08.11.2006 | ||
BG | 08.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | CZ | 08.11.2006 | |
RO | 08.11.2006 | ||
BG | 08.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | BG | 08.02.2007 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE10303106 (RUAG MUNITION THUN [CH]) [AD] 1-16 * paragraphs [0011] - [0015] - [0021] * * figure - *; | [A]US4598096 (GRANT GEORGE A [CA]) [A] 1-16 * column 5, line 8 - column 6, line 36 * * figure - *; | [A]US2003205160 (OECHSLIN ROLF [CH], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0026] , [0027] , [0038] * * figure 1 * | by applicant | DE10303106 |