EP1603190 - ANTENNA FOR PORTABLE TERMINAL AND PORTABLE TERMINAL USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.04.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 07.05.2014 [2014/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ohmi, Tadahiro 1-17-301, Komegafukuro 2-chome Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi-ken 980-0813 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/49] | For all designated states OHMI, Tadahiro 1-17-301, Komegabukuro 2-chome, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi-ken 980-0813 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHMI, Tadahiro 1-17-301, Komegafukuro 2-chome, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 9800813 / JP | 02 /
MORIMOTO, Akihiro 2-36-b201, Ayashichuo 1-chome, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 9800000 / JP | 03 /
NAKAMURA, Fumiaki 13-1-201, Hachiman 6-chome, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 9800871 / JP | [2005/49] | Representative(s) | Gill, David Alan, et al WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/49] | Gill, David Alan, et al W.P. Thompson & Co., 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04711696.7 | 17.02.2004 | [2005/49] | WO2004JP01677 | Priority number, date | JP20030040167 | 18.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003040167 | [2005/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004075343 | Date: | 02.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1603190 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.09.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/38, H01Q9/04 | [2006/52] | CPC: |
H01Q9/0485 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/49] | H01Q1/38 | Designated contracting states | FI, FR, GB, SE [2006/24] |
Former [2005/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTENNE FÜR EIN TRAGBARES ENDGERÄT UND TRAGBARES ENDGERÄT DAMIT | [2005/49] | English: | ANTENNA FOR PORTABLE TERMINAL AND PORTABLE TERMINAL USING SAME | [2005/49] | French: | ANTENNE POUR TERMINAL PORTABLE ET TERMINAL PORTABLE UTILISANT LADITE ANTENNE | [2005/49] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2005 | Translation filed | 17.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2005 | Search fee paid | 17.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/49] | 21.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/19] | 24.03.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.01.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/19] | Appeal following examination | 20.05.2009 | Appeal received No. T1576/09 | 24.07.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 21.01.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.03.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2010 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   27.08.2010 | 28.02.2011 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   26.08.2011 | 28.02.2014 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19837266 (PHILIPS CORP INTELLECTUAL PTY [DE]) [A] 1-20* abstract *; | [A]WO02075851 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract *; | [X] - POPOV A ET AL, "EVOLUTION OF 3D RADIATION PATTERNS FOR A MULTIMODE DRA", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION, XX, XX, (20000825), vol. 1, pages 73 - 76, XP008071404 [X] 1,2,4-20 * the whole document * | [A] - POPOV A ET AL, "Multi-mode dielectric resonator antenna with controllable radiation pattern", ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION SOCIETY, 1999. IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM 1999 ORLANDO, FL, USA 11-16 JULY 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19990711), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7803-5639-X, pages 30 - 33, XP010348223 [A] 1-20 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/APS.1999.789065 | [X] - JAMES J R ET AL, "Investigation of properties of electrical-small spherical ceramic antennas", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, IEE STEVENAGE, GB, (20020926), vol. 38, no. 20, ISSN 0013-5194, pages 1160 - 1162, XP006018894 [X] 1,4-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:20020818 | [A] - JUNKER G P ET AL, "NUMERICAL ANALYSIS OF DIELECTRIC RESONATOR ANTENNAS EXCITED IN QUASI-TE MODES", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, IEE STEVENAGE, GB, (19931014), vol. 29, no. 21, ISSN 0013-5194, pages 1810 - 1811, XP000404297 [A] 1-20 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH11308039 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD); | [Y]JP3280204B ; | [Y]EP0982799 (PHILIPS CORP INTELLECTUAL PTY [DE], et al); | [Y]EP1209759 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]JP2002175921 (TDK CORP) |