EP1599116 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A COOKING UTENSIL FOR AN INDUCTION HOB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2009 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.04.2009 [2009/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Newspray GmbH Cristalinweg 4 4310 Rheinfelden / CH | [2005/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRASME, Dieter Cristalinweg 4 CH-4310 Rheinfelden / CH | [2005/48] | Representative(s) | Maucher, Wolfgang, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Urachstrasse 23 79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/48] | Maucher, Wolfgang, et al Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Dreikönigstrasse 13 79102 Freiburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04712030.8 | 18.02.2004 | [2005/48] | WO2004EP01521 | Priority number, date | DE2003109018 | 01.03.2003 Original published format: DE 10309018 | [2005/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004078010 | Date: | 16.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1599116 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1599116 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A47J27/00, C23C24/04 | [2005/48] | CPC: |
A47J27/002 (EP);
C23C24/04 (EP);
C23C28/021 (EP);
C23C28/023 (EP);
C23C28/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2006/24] |
Former [2005/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES KOCHGESCHIRRS FÜR EINEN INDUKTIONSHERD | [2005/48] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A COOKING UTENSIL FOR AN INDUCTION HOB | [2005/48] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN USTENSILE DE CUISSON POUR CUISINIERE A INDUCTION | [2005/48] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/48] | 21.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]DE4405101 (EMMEL THOMAS DIPL ING) [Y] 1-6 * column 1, line 3 - line 6 * * column 1, line 42 - line 47 * * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 13 * [A] 7; | [Y]DE19747386 (LINDE AG) [Y] 1-6 * column 2, line 46 - line 58 *; | [A]DE3639013 (FISSLER GMBH) [A] 1-5 * column 2, line 27 - column 3, line 37; figure 1 * |