EP1600778 - BLOOD ANALYSIS DEVICE AND BLOOD ANALYSIS METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Agency 1-8, Honcho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0012 / JP | [2013/30] |
Former [2005/48] | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Agency 1-8, Honcho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0012 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OGAWA, Hiroki 330 Yokohama Island Garden, 2-28-1, Heian-cho Tsurumi-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa230-0031 / JP | 02 /
HORIIKE, Yasuhiro 3-2-12, Higashifushimi Nishitokyo-shi, Tokyo 202-0021 / JP | [2005/48] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/48] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04712243.7 | 18.02.2004 | [2005/48] | WO2004JP01802 | Priority number, date | JP20030040481 | 19.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003040481 | [2005/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004074846 | Date: | 02.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1600778 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1600778 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.09.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/00, G01N33/49 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
G01N33/491 (EP,KR,US);
B01L3/502753 (EP,KR,US);
B01L2200/10 (EP,KR,US);
B01L2200/148 (EP,KR,US);
B01L2300/0645 (EP,KR,US);
B01L2300/0816 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/48] | G01N35/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/48] | Title | German: | BLUTANALYSEVORRICHTUNG UND BLUTANALYSEVERFAHREN | [2005/48] | English: | BLOOD ANALYSIS DEVICE AND BLOOD ANALYSIS METHOD | [2005/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ANALYSE DE SANG ET PROCEDE D'ANALYSE DE SANG | [2005/48] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2005 | Translation filed | 07.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2005 | Search fee paid | 07.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/48] | 10.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.02.2004 | AT | 24.07.2013 | BG | 24.07.2013 | CY | 24.07.2013 | CZ | 24.07.2013 | DK | 24.07.2013 | EE | 24.07.2013 | ES | 24.07.2013 | FI | 24.07.2013 | IT | 24.07.2013 | MC | 24.07.2013 | RO | 24.07.2013 | SI | 24.07.2013 | SK | 24.07.2013 | TR | 24.07.2013 | GR | 25.10.2013 | PT | 25.11.2013 | IE | 18.02.2014 | LU | 18.02.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 18.02.2004 | |
AT | 24.07.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
IT | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
IE | 18.02.2014 | ||
LU | 18.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
IT | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
IE | 18.02.2014 | ||
LU | 18.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
IT | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
IE | 18.02.2014 | ||
LU | 18.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
IT | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
LU | 18.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
IT | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
AT | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
AT | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
AT | 24.07.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | PT | 25.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4940527 (KAZLAUSKAS VIDAS P [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * page 2, line 34 - page 4, line 12 * * figure - *; | [A]US5160702 (KOPF-SILL ANNE R [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * column 8, line 22 - line 39 ** figure 1 *; | [A]WO9533986 (ABAY SA [US]) [A] 1-17 * column 3, line 26 - line 49 * * figures 3, 4, 6 *; | [A]US6002475 (BOYD DOUGLAS E [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * column 2, line 44 - line 67 * * figure - * | International search | [A]JPS6425058 (MILES INC); | [A]US4812294 (COMBS JOHN W [US]); | [A]JPH03178641 (TERUMO CORP, et al); | [A]JP2000042402 (KAWAMURA INST CHEM RES); | [A]JP2001258868 (KIKUCHI JUN, et al); | [A] - MODOKA TAKAI, "Uji capillary ketsueki enshin bunri kino o motsu takomku sokutei chip no sakusei (24p-W-15)", 2002 NEN (HEISEI 14 NEN) SHUKI DAI 63 KAI EXTENDED ABSTRACTS; THE JAPAN SOCIETY OF APPLIED PHYSICS,, (20020924), vol. 3, page 1143, XP002986834 |