EP1596233 - OPTICAL MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS K. K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/46] | For all designated states HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS K. K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOSHINO, Yasuji, C/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.k. 1126 -1, Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka, 435-8558 / JP | 02 /
IIDA, Takashi, C/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.k. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka, 435-8558 / JP | 03 /
WARASHINA, Yoshihisa, C/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.k. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka, 435-8558 / JP | 04 /
TABATA, Kei, C/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.k. 1126-1, Ichino-cho, H amamatsu-shi, Shizuoka, 4358558 / JP | [2005/46] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2005/46] | Frost, Alex John, et al Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 04712756.8 | 19.02.2004 | [2005/46] | WO2004JP01926 | Priority number, date | JP20030041472 | 19.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003041472 | [2005/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004074896 | Date: | 02.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1596233 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.09.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/42 | [2005/46] | CPC: |
G02B6/423 (EP,US);
G02B6/38 (KR);
G02B6/4201 (EP,US);
G02B6/4214 (EP,US);
G02B6/4243 (EP,US);
G02B6/4249 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/45144, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/24] |
Former [2005/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHES MODUL | [2005/46] | English: | OPTICAL MODULE | [2005/46] | French: | MODULE OPTIQUE | [2005/46] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2005 | Translation filed | 25.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2005 | Search fee paid | 25.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/46] | 03.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.08.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4897711 (BLONDER GREG E [US], et al) [X] 1,8-10 * column 3, line 14 - column 4, line 48 * * column 6, line 20 - line 46 *; | [A]JPH0339706 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 2,3,6 * abstract *; | [X]DE19932430 (HARTING ELEKTROOPTISCHE BAUTEILE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-10 * column 1, line 18 - line 34 * * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 17 * * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 6 * * column 4, line 18 - line 56; figure 1 * * column 5, line 35 - line 40 *; | [A]US6187515 (TRAN DEAN [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 40 - line 46 * * column 4, line 23 - column 5, line 7 * * column 7, line 8 - line 16; figure 6 * * column 8, line 18 - line 32; figure 7 *; | [A]JP2001051162 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [A] 2,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0023] , [0032]; figures 5,8 *; | [A]US2002181882 (HIBBS-BRENNER MARY K [US], et al) [A] 1,2,6,7,9,10* figure 1a * | International search | [Y]JPH01183606 (FUJITSU LTD); | [Y]US4897711 (BLONDER GREG E [US], et al); | [Y]JPH07301729 (RICOH KK); | [Y]JP2000275472 (FUJITSU LTD); | [Y]US6132107 (MORIKAWA TAKENORI [JP]); | [Y]US6250820 (MELCHIOR LUTZ [DE], et al); | [Y]US6270263 (IWASE MASAYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]US6377385 (SAITO TAKESHI [JP]) |