EP1597123 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE COMPUTER-ASSISTED CALCULATION OF THE AXLE LOAD OF A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2012 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [2011/26] |
Former [2005/47] | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE SYSTEME FÜR NUTZFAHRZEUGE GMBH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HECKER, Falk Im Bäumle 33 71706 Markgröningen / DE | 02 /
HORN, Matthias Kaiserslauterer Strasse 40 70499 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
GÜCKER, Ulrich Im Wolfsgalgen 42 71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | 04 /
HUMMEL, Stefan Wilhelm-Blos-Str. 50 71191 Stuttgart / DE | [2005/47] | Representative(s) | Schönmann, Kurt Knorr-Bremse Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/47] | Schönmann, Kurt Knorr-Bremse, Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04713017.4 | 20.02.2004 | [2005/47] | WO2004EP01669 | Priority number, date | DE2003107510 | 21.02.2003 Original published format: DE 10307510 | [2005/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004074058 | Date: | 02.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1597123 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1597123 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/17 | [2011/08] | CPC: |
B60T8/172 (EP,US);
B60T2240/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/47] | B60T8/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR COMPUTERGESTÜTZTEN BERECHNUNG DER ACHSLASTEN EINES FAHRZEUGS | [2005/47] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE COMPUTER-ASSISTED CALCULATION OF THE AXLE LOAD OF A VEHICLE | [2005/47] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE CALCUL ASSISTE PAR ORDINATEUR DES CHARGES PAR ESSIEU D'UN VEHICULE | [2005/47] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/47] | 21.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.06.2007 | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.02.2004 | CY | 29.06.2011 | CZ | 29.06.2011 | DK | 29.06.2011 | EE | 29.06.2011 | FI | 29.06.2011 | IE | 29.06.2011 | NL | 29.06.2011 | RO | 29.06.2011 | SI | 29.06.2011 | SK | 29.06.2011 | TR | 29.06.2011 | BG | 29.09.2011 | GR | 30.09.2011 | ES | 10.10.2011 | PT | 31.10.2011 | AT | 20.02.2012 | GB | 20.02.2012 | LU | 20.02.2012 | BE | 28.02.2012 | CH | 29.02.2012 | FR | 29.02.2012 | LI | 29.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
TR | 29.06.2011 | ||
BG | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
ES | 10.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
AT | 20.02.2012 | ||
GB | 20.02.2012 | ||
LU | 20.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
TR | 29.06.2011 | ||
BG | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
ES | 10.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
AT | 20.02.2012 | ||
GB | 20.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/31] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
BG | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
ES | 10.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
AT | 20.02.2012 | ||
GB | 20.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
BG | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
ES | 10.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
GB | 20.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
ES | 10.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
GB | 20.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
GB | 20.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/31] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | CZ | 29.06.2011 | |
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | CZ | 29.06.2011 | |
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | EE | 29.06.2011 | |
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | FI | 29.06.2011 | |
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | FI | 29.06.2011 | |
GR | 30.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19603430 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,7,9 * claim 1 * * figure 3 *; | [A]US6473682 (NAKAMURA AKIRA [JP]) [A] 1,7,9 * column 23, line 1 - line 13 *; | [A]US2002157746 (MERINO-LOPEZ JOSE [FR], et al) [A] 1,7,9* paragraphs [0091] - [0099] * |