EP1594935 - REACTIVATABLE ADHESIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.2008 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Starch and Chemical Investment Holding Corporation 1000 Uniqema Boulevard New Castle Delaware 19720 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/46] | For all designated states National Starch and Chemical Investment Holding Corporation 1000 Uniqema Boulevard New Castle Delaware 19720 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GONG, Lie-Zhong 4 Lynch Court Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | 02 /
MEHAFFY, Justin, A. 4 Crabapple Cove Hampton, NJ 08827 / US | [2005/46] | Representative(s) | Held, Stephan, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/46] | Held, Stephan, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 03 29 81630 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04713425.9 | 20.02.2004 | [2005/46] | WO2004US05140 | Priority number, date | US20030371668 | 22.02.2003 Original published format: US 371668 | [2005/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004076578 | Date: | 10.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1594935 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C09J9/00 | [2005/46] | CPC: |
C09J163/00 (EP,US);
C08G18/10 (EP,US);
C08G59/4021 (EP,US);
C09J11/02 (EP,US);
C09J175/04 (EP,US);
C09J7/35 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/286 (US,EP);
C08G18/10, C08G18/3206 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REAKTIVIERBARER KLEBSTOFF | [2005/46] | English: | REACTIVATABLE ADHESIVE | [2005/46] | French: | ADHESIF REACTIVABLE | [2005/46] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/46] | 01.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 29.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/46] | 20.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0249940 (ASHLAND OIL INC [US]) [X] 1-19 * page 3, lines 10-29; claim - *; | [X]US5075034 (WANTHAL MARK A [US]) [X] 1-19 * column 2, line 17 - column 3, line 20; claim - *; | [X]US5238975 (JOHNSON ERIC J [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * column 1, line 44 - column 2, line 57; example -; claim - *; | [X]US5340649 (ROEKER DAVID C [US], et al) [X] 1-19* column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 13 * |